Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10816162 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2020 | B2 | US2019368682 | 05.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017007687 | 19.01.2017 | WO2018JP01637 | 19.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110192063B | Global Dossier | 09.07.2021 | B | CN110192063 | 30.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017007687 | 19.01.2017 | WO2018JP01637 | 19.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3572717 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2021 | B1 | EP3572717 | 02.09.2020 | A4 | EP3572717 | 27.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017007687 | 19.01.2017 | WO2018JP01637 | 19.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018135637 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017007687 | 19.01.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6932933B | Global Dossier | 08.09.2021 | B2 | JP2018116868 | 26.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017007687 | 19.01.2017 |