EP3572482 - CD-FREE COLLOIDAL QUANTUM DOT CAPABLE OF EMITTING VISIBLE FLUORESCENCE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1, Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | [2020/32] |
Former [2019/48] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OMATA, Takahisa c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 02 /
UNO, Takahiro c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corporation Central Research Institute 15-2 Aza Fukimatsu Onahama Iwaki-shi Fukushima 971-8101 / JP | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/48] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 18741280.4 | 15.01.2018 | [2019/48] | WO2018JP00807 | Priority number, date | JP20170006353 | 18.01.2017 Original published format: JP 2017006353 | JP20170248935 | 26.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017248935 | [2019/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018135434 | Date: | 26.07.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3572482 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/88, C09K11/70, C09K11/56, C01B19/00 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
C01B19/007 (EP,US);
C09K11/88 (KR);
C09K11/883 (EP,US);
C01B19/002 (US);
C09K11/565 (EP);
C09K11/70 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/48] | C09K11/88, C09K11/08, H01L33/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Title | German: | SICHTBARE FLUORESZENZ EMITTIERENDER CD-FREIER KOLLOIDALER QUANTENPUNKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/48] | English: | CD-FREE COLLOIDAL QUANTUM DOT CAPABLE OF EMITTING VISIBLE FLUORESCENCE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2019/48] | French: | POINT QUANTIQUE COLLOÏDAL EXEMPT DE CD CAPABLE D'ÉMETTRE UNE FLUORESCENCE VISIBLE, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2019/48] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2019 | Translation filed | 13.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 07.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/52] | 24.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]WO2005071764 (HOYA CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 2-5 * , paragraphs [0050], [0089]-[0094] & US 2008/0122341 A1 paragraphs [0075]-[0076], [0160]-[0171] & CN 1910763 A *; | [X]JP2006291175 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL) [X] 1 * , claims, paragraphs [0054], [0129]-[0130], embodiment 5 (Family: none) *; | [XY]WO2007034877 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN [JP], et al) [X] 1 * , claims, paragraphs [0052]-[0184], embodiment 5 & US 2009/0108235 A1 claims, paragraphs [0030]-[0166], embodiment 5 * [Y] 2-5; | [A]JP2008547235 (SEOUL OPTO DEVICE CO., LTD.) [A] 1-5 * , claims, embodiments & US 2008/0185604 A1 claims, embodiments & WO 2007/007954 A1 *; | [A]JP2009516182 (SIGNALOMICS GMBH) [A] 1-5 * , claims, embodiments & US 2009/0226371 A1 claims, embodiments & WO 2007/057182 A2 & EP 1787659 A1 & CN 101360515 A *; | [A]WO2010071137 (METRO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-5* , claims, embodiments & CN 102257508 A *; | [A]JP2011505432 (EASTMAN KODAK CO.) [A] 1-5 * , claims, embodiments & US 2010/0289003 A1 claims, embodiments & WO 2009/058173 A1 & EP 2215187 A1 & CN 101835875 A *; | [A]JP2013539798 (YISSUM RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY OF THE HEBREW UNIVERSITY OF JERUSA) [A] 1-5 * , claims, embodiments & US 2013/0115455 A1 claims, embodiments & WO 2012/035535 A1 & EP 2616522 A1 & CN 103154183 A *; | [A]JP2015516467 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V.) [A] 1-5 * , claims, embodiments & US 2014/0369024 A1 claims, embodiments & WO 2013/114254 A2 & EP 2809710 A2 & CN 104105739 A * | by applicant | JPS6353 | JP2017006353 | - RYU et al., Chem. Mater., (20090000), vol. 21, no. 4 | - NOSE et al., J. Phys . : Conf. Ser., (20090000), vol. 165, page 012028 | - KAMATA et al., J. Crystal Growth, (19970000), vol. 170 | - NANDA et al., J. Appl. Phys., (20040000), vol. 95, no. 9 | - PELLEGRINI et al., J. Appl. Phys., (20050000), vol. 97, page 073706 | JP20170248935 |