EP3662332 - ONBOARD CONTROL UNIT FOR A DRONE SYSTEM, DRONE AND DRONE SYSTEM COMPRISING THE ONBOARD CONTROL UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Defence and Space SAS 31 rue des Cosmonautes ZI du Palays 31402 Toulouse Cedex 4 / FR | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOS, Frédéric 42, Grande Rue 78790 Arnouville Lès Mantes / FR | 02 /
BERTOLACCI, Thierry 3, allée de Marly 78630 Orgeval / FR | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 25 rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | [2020/24] | Application number, filing date | 18742834.7 | 26.07.2018 | [2020/24] | WO2018EP70350 | Priority number, date | FR20170057389 | 01.08.2017 Original published format: FR 1757389 | [2020/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019025293 | Date: | 07.02.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3662332 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/00, B64C39/02, G05D1/10 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
G05D1/102 (EP);
G08G5/0039 (US);
B64U10/13 (EP,US);
H04B7/18506 (US);
B64U2201/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Title | German: | BORDSTEUERUNGSEINHEIT FÜR EIN DROHNENSYSTEM, DROHNE UND DROHNENSYSTEM MIT DER BORDSTEUEREINHEIT | [2020/24] | English: | ONBOARD CONTROL UNIT FOR A DRONE SYSTEM, DRONE AND DRONE SYSTEM COMPRISING THE ONBOARD CONTROL UNIT | [2020/24] | French: | UNITÉ DE COMMANDE EMBARQUÉE POUR UN SYSTÈME DE DRONE, DRONE ET SYSTÈME DE DRONE COMPRENANT L'UNITÉ DE COMMANDE EMBARQUÉE | [2020/24] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 27.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/16] | 14.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2016070265 (LIU ANG [CN], et al); | [XYI]US2016125746 (KUNZI FABRICE [US], et al); | [XY]US2016286128 (ZHOU DYLAN TX [US]) |