EP3645134 - STORABLE EXERCISE BENCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Correction of patent specification | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Health Tech Retail, Inc. 1600 Landmark Drive Cottage Grove, Wisconsin 53527 / US | [2024/39] |
Former [2024/36] | For all designated states Johnson Health Tech Retail, Inc. 1600 Landmark Drive Cottage Drive, Wisconsin 53527 / US | ||
Former [2024/33] | For all designated states BowFlex Inc. 17750 SE 6th Way Vancouver, WA 98683 / US | ||
Former [2020/19] | For all designated states Nautilus, Inc. 17750 SE 6th Way Vancouver, WA 98683 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAKER, Bryce C. 517 SE 121St Avenue 90 Vancouver Washington 98683 / US | 02 /
POHL, Ryan J. 3406 NW 30Th Circle Camas Washington 98607 / US | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP, et al Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2024/34] |
Former [2020/19] | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 18743183.8 | 26.06.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018US39535 | Priority number, date | US201762524749P | 26.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762524749 P | [2020/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019005820 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3645134 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3645134 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3645134 | Date: | 02.10.2024 | [2024/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A63B21/00, A63B23/00, A63B23/02, A63B71/02 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
A63B21/4029 (EP,US);
A63B23/00 (EP,US);
A63B23/0211 (EP,US);
A63B2071/025 (EP,US);
A63B21/078 (US);
A63B2210/50 (EP,US);
A63B2225/09 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSTAUBARE ÜBUNGSBANK | [2020/19] | English: | STORABLE EXERCISE BENCH | [2020/19] | French: | BANC D'EXERCICE POUVANT ÊTRE RANGÉ | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 13.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24188002.0 / EP4420748 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5865713 (HSU HANK [TW]); | [XI]US6030324 (MCBRIDE ROBERT W [US]); | [X]US6350221 (KRULL MARK A [US]); | [A]WO2006023550 (NAUTILUS INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2014201296 (ICON HEALTH & FITNESS INC [US]) | Examination | US2006035772 |