EP3573632 - TUMOR SELECTIVE TATA-BOX AND CAAT-BOX MUTANT ONCOLYTIC VIRUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/49] | TUMOR SELECTIVE TATA-BOX AND CAAT-BOX MUTANTS | ||
[2024/12] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EpicentRx, Inc. 11099 North Torrey Pines Road Suite 160 La Jolla, California 92037 / US | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REID, Tony, R. 5517 Carriage Court San Diego CA 92130 / US | 02 /
ORONSKY, Bryan, T. 28540 Matadero Creek Lane Los Altos Hills CA 94022 / US | 03 /
HEDJRAN, Farah 4445 Eastgate Mall Suite 200 San Diego CA 92121 / US | 04 /
LARSON, Christopher 3815 Lebon Dr. Apt. 335 San Diego CA 92122 / US | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | Graham Watt & Co LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks TN13 3AJ / GB | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 18744813.9 | 30.01.2018 | [2019/49] | WO2018US16025 | Priority number, date | US201762452075P | 30.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762452075 P | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018140970 | Date: | 02.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3573632 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3573632 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 02.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/535, C12N15/86, A61K35/76, A61P35/00, C12N7/00, A61K35/761 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
A61K35/76 (EP,EA,KR);
C12N7/00 (EP,EA,KR);
C12N15/86 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K35/761 (EP,EA,US);
A61K48/00 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07K14/535 (EP);
C12N2710/10321 (EP,EA,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/39] | A61K35/76, C12N15/86, A61K35/761, A61P35/00, C12N7/00 | ||
Former IPC [2019/49] | A61K35/76, C12N15/86 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TUMORSELEKTIV ONKOLYTISCHES VIRUS MIT TATA-BOX- UND CAAT-BOX-MUTATIONEN | [2024/12] | English: | TUMOR SELECTIVE TATA-BOX AND CAAT-BOX MUTANT ONCOLYTIC VIRUSES | [2024/12] | French: | VIRUS ONCOLYTIQUES MUTANTS DE BOÎTE TATA ET DE BOÎTE CAAT SÉLECTIFS DE TUMEURS | [2024/12] |
Former [2019/49] | TUMORSELEKTIVE TATA-BOX- UND CAAT-BOX-MUTANTEN | ||
Former [2019/49] | TUMOR SELECTIVE TATA-BOX AND CAAT-BOX MUTANTS | ||
Former [2019/49] | MUTANTS DE BOÎTE TATA ET DE BOÎTE CAAT SÉLECTIFS DE TUMEURS | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 25.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.03.2024 | 29.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2020 | 31.01.2021 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.02.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2018218240 (EPICENTRX INC [US]) | International search | [X]WO2010086838 (ONCOS THERAPEUTICS [FI], et al); | [XA]WO2010101921 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al); | [X]EP3006566 (ONCOS THERAPEUTICS LTD [FI]); | by applicant | WO2010101921 |