EP3560170 - PENETRATION TESTING OF A NETWORKED SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XM Cyber Ltd. 11 Galgalei ha-Plada St. 4672211 Hertzelia / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | For all designated states XM Cyber Ltd. Galgalei ha-Plada St 11 4672211 Hertsliya / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GORODISSKY, Boaz 12 Haganim Street 4522176 Hod-Hasharon / IL | 02 /
ASHKENAZI, Adi 12 Buckingham Road Killara New South Wales, 2071 / AU | 03 /
SEGAL, Ronen 42 Pinsker Street 4649059 Hertzelia / IL | [2020/09] |
Former [2019/44] | 01 /
GORODISSKY, Boaz 12 Haganim Street 4522176 Hod-Hasharon / IL | ||
02 /
ASHKENAZI, Adi 17 Anatot Street 6908017 Tel Aviv / IL | |||
03 /
SEGAL, Ronen 42 Pinsker Street 4649059 Hertzelia / IL | Representative(s) | Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton, York YO26 6QY / GB | Application number, filing date | 18744986.3 | 18.01.2018 | [2019/44] | WO2018IB50328 | Priority number, date | US201762451850P | 30.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762451850 P | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018138608 | Date: | 02.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3560170 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/57, H04L29/06 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
H04L63/1433 (EP,IL,US);
H04L41/048 (EP,IL,US);
H04L43/50 (EP,IL,US);
H04L63/20 (EP,IL,US);
H04L63/30 (IL,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/44] | H04L29/06, H04L12/26, G06F21/57 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Title | German: | PENETRATIONSPRÜFUNG EINES VERNETZTEN SYSTEMS | [2019/44] | English: | PENETRATION TESTING OF A NETWORKED SYSTEM | [2019/44] | French: | TEST DE PÉNÉTRATION D'UN SYSTÈME EN RÉSEAU | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 12.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007204347 (CACERES MAXIMILIANO G [AR], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0061] ** paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0069] *; | [X]US2009044277 (AARON JEFFREY A [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0112] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0130] *; | [X]US2013031635 (LOTEM AMNON [IL], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0177] * * paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0176] * | International search | [Y]US2009044277 (AARON JEFFREY A [US]) [Y] 1-15, 18-21, 29, 30 * See claim 1. *; | [A]US2011035803 (LUCANGELI OBES JORGE [AR], et al) [A] 1-35 * See claims 1-10 and fig. 12. *; | [A]US2013014263 (PORCELLO DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * See claims 1-12 and fig. 3. *; | [XY]US2013031635 (LOTEM AMNON [IL], et al) [X] 16, 17, 22-28, 31-35 * See claim 1 and paragraphs [0070], [0170], [0172]. * [Y] 1-15, 18-21, 29, 30; | [A]US2014237606 (FUTORANSKY ARIEL [AR], et al) [A] 1-35* See claims 1-7 and fig. 1. * |