Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11592069 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2023 | B2 | US2020141462 | 07.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710470375 | 20.06.2017 | WO2018CN82397 | 09.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3447089 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2020 | B1 | EP3447089 | 26.06.2019 | A4 | EP3447089 | 27.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710470375 | 20.06.2017 | WO2018CN82397 | 09.04.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018233349 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710470375 | 20.06.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107286570B | Global Dossier | 29.05.2018 | B | CN107286570 | 24.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201710470375 | 20.06.2017 |