EP3447089 - YAW BRAKE BLOCK AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forda Energy UK Limited 6th Floor 25 Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB | For all designated states Zhang, Pengfei Room 903, Juhai Commercial Building, University East Street, Saihan District Huhehaote, Inner Mongolia 010000 / CN | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Pengfei Room 903 Juhai Commercial Building University East Street Saihan District Huhehaote Inner Mongolia 010000 / CN | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 18745805.4 | 09.04.2018 | [2019/09] | WO2018CN82397 | Priority number, date | CN201710470375 | 20.06.2017 Original published format: CN201710470375 | [2019/09] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018233349 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3447089 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3447089 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/04, C08K3/28, C08K7/14, C08K3/14, C08K3/30, C08K7/06, F03D7/02, F16D69/02 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
C08K3/04 (EP,CN);
C08K13/06 (CN);
F16D69/026 (EP,US);
B29B9/06 (US);
B29C45/0001 (US);
C08K3/041 (EP);
C08K3/14 (EP);
C08K3/28 (EP,CN);
C08K3/30 (EP,CN);
C08K7/06 (EP,CN);
C08K7/14 (EP,CN);
C08K7/24 (CN);
C08K9/02 (CN);
F03D7/0204 (EP,US);
F16D69/023 (CN);
B29K2071/00 (US);
B29K2307/04 (US);
B29K2309/08 (US);
B29K2507/04 (US);
B29K2509/02 (US);
B29L2031/16 (US);
C08G2650/40 (EP);
C08K2003/3009 (EP,CN);
C08K2201/011 (CN);
C08L2201/08 (CN);
F05B2260/902 (EP);
F05B2280/105 (EP);
F05B2280/2006 (EP);
F05B2280/2007 (EP);
F05B2280/2008 (EP);
F16D2200/0052 (US);
F16D2200/0065 (US);
F16D2200/0086 (US);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K13/06, C08L61/16 (CN);
C08K3/041, C08L71/12 (EP);
C08K3/04, C08L61/16 (CN);
C08K3/04, C08L71/12 (EP);
C08K3/14, C08L71/12 (EP);
C08K3/28, C08L61/16 (CN);
C08K3/28, C08L71/12 (EP);
C08K3/30, C08L61/16 (CN);
C08K7/06, C08L61/16 (CN);
C08K7/06, C08L71/12 (EP);
C08K7/14, C08L61/16 (CN);
C08K7/14, C08L71/12 (EP);
C08K7/24, C08L61/16 (CN);
C08K9/02, C08L61/16 (CN); |
Former IPC [2019/26] | C08K7/06, C08K3/04, C08K3/28, C08K3/30, C08K3/40, C08K7/14, F03D15/00, C08L71/12, F16D69/02 | ||
Former IPC [2019/09] | C08L61/16, C08L61/04, C08K13/06, C08K9/02, C08K7/06, C08K3/04, F16D69/02, B29C45/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AZIMUTBREMSBLOCK UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2019/09] | English: | YAW BRAKE BLOCK AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR | [2019/09] | French: | BLOC DE FREIN D'ORIENTATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ASSOCIÉ | [2019/09] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2018 | Translation filed | 07.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 16.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.04.2018 | AL | 17.06.2020 | CY | 17.06.2020 | DK | 17.06.2020 | EE | 17.06.2020 | ES | 17.06.2020 | FI | 17.06.2020 | HR | 17.06.2020 | IT | 17.06.2020 | LT | 17.06.2020 | LV | 17.06.2020 | MC | 17.06.2020 | MK | 17.06.2020 | MT | 17.06.2020 | PL | 17.06.2020 | RO | 17.06.2020 | RS | 17.06.2020 | SE | 17.06.2020 | SI | 17.06.2020 | SK | 17.06.2020 | SM | 17.06.2020 | BG | 17.09.2020 | NO | 17.09.2020 | GR | 18.09.2020 | IS | 17.10.2020 | PT | 19.10.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 09.04.2018 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
MK | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 09.04.2018 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 17.06.2020 | |
NO | 17.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN101413559 (GUIZHOU XIN AN AVIAT MACHINERY [CN]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015159693 (CORTS JOCHEN [DE]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0050] *; | [A]US2015308532 (KOBUNE MIKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0005] - [0017] - [0 31] , [0 44] * | International search | [Y]CN103772741 (HEFEI GENIUS NEW MAT CO LTD) [Y] 2, 5, 6 * , see description, paragraphs [0004]-[0015] *; | [A]WO2015197460 (SKF AB [SE]) [A] 1-10* , see the whole description *; | [Y]CN105440574 (WENZHOU YUANQIN PETROCHEMICAL MACHINERY CO LTD) [Y] 3 * , see claim 5 *; | [XY]CN105524291 (NANJING COMP TECH MAT CO LTD, et al) [X] 1, 4 * , see description, paragraphs [0003]-[0014] * [Y] 2-3, 5-10; | [XY]CN105733181 (HEILONGJIANG XINDA ENTPR GROUP CO LTD) [X] 1, 4 * , see claims 1-6 * [Y] 2-3, 5-10; | [Y]CN106433020 (LANZHOU INST CHEMICAL PHYSICS CAS) [Y] 3, 7 * , see description, paragraphs [0005]-[0006] *; | [PX]CN107286570 (FANGDA ENERGY GROUP CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * , see claims 1-10 * |