26.07.2024 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
20.04.2024 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.11.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.07.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.09.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.07.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.06.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.05.2022 |
First examination report |
|
09.07.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 14.10.2020 [2020/42] |
11.09.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.10.2020 [2020/42] |
22.07.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.06.2020 |
Change - inventor |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
17.04.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
17.04.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
17.04.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
24.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.01.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.01.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
14.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.08.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|