EP3661461 - CUSTOM MADE HIP IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bispebjerg Hospital Bispebjerg Bakke 23 2400 Copenhagen NV / DK | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAURITZEN, BRUUN, Jes Grønningen 21, 4. 1270 København K / DK | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2020/24] | Application number, filing date | 18745979.7 | 02.08.2018 | [2020/24] | WO2018EP71003 | Priority number, date | EP20170184441 | 02.08.2017 Original published format: EP 17184441 | [2020/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019025546 | Date: | 07.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3661461 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/30, A61F2/36 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
A61F2/3603 (EP,US);
A61F2/30942 (EP,US);
A61F2/30756 (EP);
A61F2002/30324 (EP);
A61F2002/307 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30757 (EP);
A61F2002/30948 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3208 (EP);
A61F2002/3605 (US);
A61F2002/4633 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Title | German: | MASSGESCHNEIDERTES HÜFTIMPLANTAT | [2020/24] | English: | CUSTOM MADE HIP IMPLANT | [2020/24] | French: | IMPLANT DE HANCHE PERSONNALISÉ | [2020/24] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 25.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009226068 (FITZ WOLFGANG [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0086] - [0088] - [0172] , [0205] - [0219] *; | [A]US2013211529 (FRAUENS JOHN T [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0012] , [0014] , [0035] , [0050] *; | [A]WO2014059388 (POLY MED INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0043] , [0158] , [0159] *; | [AD]WO2014094785 (BISPEBJERG HOSPITAL [DK]) [AD] 1-6* figure - * | by applicant | WO2014094785 |