|
04.02.2025 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2025 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2024 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2024 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.12.2024 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.12.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2024 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2024 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2024 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.08.2024 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2024 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
16.08.2024 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
18.07.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.07.2024 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.07.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2024 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2024 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2024 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2024 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2024 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2024 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.02.2024 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
08.02.2024 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.02.2024 |
Description |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
08.02.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2024 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.10.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.10.2023 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
28.07.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2023 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2020 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2020 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2020 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.02.2020 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.11.2019 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.02.2019 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
97 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
74 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
23.08.2018 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
14.08.2018 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
17.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
54 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
12 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |