EP3664608 - HERBICIDAL MIXTURES COMPRISING L-GLUFOSINATE OR ITS SALT AND AT LEAST ONE VLCFA INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.05.2023 [2023/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINTER, Christian Harald Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
GEWEHR, Markus Speyerer Straße 2 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18746951.5 | 02.08.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018EP70951 | Priority number, date | EP20170185455 | 09.08.2017 Original published format: EP 17185455 | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019030104 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3664608 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/22, A01N37/26, A01N43/10, A01N43/56, A01N43/80, A01N43/82, A01N47/38, A01N57/20, A01P13/00, A01N39/02, A01N37/20 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
A01N57/20 (EP,KR,US);
A01N37/20 (EP,KR);
A01N37/22 (EP,KR);
A01N37/26 (EP,KR,US);
A01N39/02 (EP,KR);
A01N43/10 (EP,KR);
A01N43/56 (EP,KR);
A01N43/80 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/82 (EP,KR);
A01N47/38 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Title | German: | HERBIZIDMISCHUNGEN MIT L-GLUFOSINAT ODER DESSEN SALZ UND MINDESTENS EINEM VLCFA-HEMMER | [2020/25] | English: | HERBICIDAL MIXTURES COMPRISING L-GLUFOSINATE OR ITS SALT AND AT LEAST ONE VLCFA INHIBITOR | [2020/25] | French: | MÉLANGES HERBICIDES COMPRENANT DU L-GLUFOSINATE OU SON SEL ET AU MOINS UN INHIBITEUR DE VLCFA | [2020/25] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 09.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2022 | Observations by third parties | 14.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2022 | Observations by third parties | 10.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2022 | Observations by third parties | 04.04.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/19] | 27.06.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US6165939 (AGBAJE HENRY E [US], et al) [I] 1-6,8-15 * ex. 17; Claims 1-26 *; | [ID]WO2009141367 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [ID] 1-6,8-15 * page 1, l. 7-12, page 54 , l. 20-21; Claim 1-2, Claim 3 (C.8), Claim 8 (C.8); Claims 20-30. *; | [I]US2011224077 (HACKER ERWIN [DE], et al) [I] 1-6,8-15 * [0035], [0036], [0260]-[0262]Tables 1, 7, 10, 11 and 18; claims 1-12 *; | [X]US2011287933 (HACKER ERWIN [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,8-15 * [0020], [0024], [0073]-[0075], Table 2 :A1.2+ (B1.9-B1.16), [0160], Table 4, Claims 4-6 *; | [X]US2011287932 (HACKER ERWIN [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,8-15 * [0019], [0023], [0073], [0075]-[0076], Table 2: (A1.2+(B1.0-B1.23)-C28; Table 3; Table 7; claims 1-19 *; | [I]US2011287934 (HACKER ERWIN [DE], et al) [I] 1-6,8-15 * [0020], [0021], [0072], Table 1; claims 1-15 *; | [X]US2011294663 (HACKER ERWIN [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,8-15 * 0020], [0024], [0076] (C11, C12); Table 2: (A1.2 + (B1.0-B1.23)+ ((C11 or C12); Table 3; [0172], Tables 6 and 7; claims 1-16. *; | [X]WO2012024524 (MONSANTO TECHNOLOGY LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-15 * [0023], [0133], claims 8-10, 26, 29, 60, 83, 101 and 102 *; | CN102715186 [ ] (XUEQUAN WANG) [ ] * the whole document *; | CN102763676 [ ] (XUEQUAN WANG) [ ] * the whole document *; | [X]US2013023413 (HACKER ERWIN [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,8-15* [0017], [0021], [0080], [0082], [0087], Table 2: A1.2+ (B1.0-B1.23)+(C1.5, C1.7 or C1.12); [0205], Table 3; claims 1-15 *; | CN103371174 [ ] (SHAANXI WEIERQI CROP PROT CO) [ ] * the whole document *; | [I]WO2016113334 (BASF SE [DE]) [I] 1-6,8-15 * Table A (No. 70); page 54 , l.20-21; Tables 3-4 and 13 Claim 1C8), claims 9-15 *; | [I] - MONIKA RUHLAND ET AL, "Distribution and metabolism ofD/L-,L- andD-glufosinate in transgenic, glufosinate-tolerant crops of maize(Zea mays L sspmays) and oilseed rape(Brassica napus L varnapus)", PEST MANAGEMENT SCIENCE, BOGNOR REGIS; GB, (20040614), vol. 60, no. 7, doi:10.1002/ps.857, ISSN 1526-498X, pages 691 - 696, XP055415713 [I] 1-6,8-15 * page 691, left column * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ps.857 | [I] - ZHANG, WEI, "Herbicidal composition containing glufosinate and amides herbicide, preparation method and application thereof", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20131030), Database accession no. 2013:1691324, URL: STN, XP002778051 [I] 1-6,8-15 * abstract * | [I] - THARP BRENT, KELLS JAMES, "Residual Herbicides used in Combination with Glyphosate and Glufosinate in Corn (Zea mays)", WEED TECHNOLOGY, (20020401), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 274 - 281, XP009503403 [I] 1-6,8-15 * Tables 3, 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1614/0890-037X(2002)016¢0274:RHUICW!2.0.CO;2 | [I] - WANG, XUEQUAN, "Synergistic herbicidal composition containing glufosinate-ammonium and S-metolachlor", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2012:1492518, URL: STN, XP002780607 [I] 1-6,8-15 * abstract * | [I] - WANG xuequan, "Glufosinate containing compound herbicide", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (2012), Database accession no. 2012:1642498, XP002780608 [I] 1-6,8-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US4265654 | EP0127429 | US5530142 | DE19836726 | WO2006024820 | US7105470 | WO2006104120 | WO2007071900 | WO2007096576 | WO2009141367 | EP3028573 | WO2017011288 | - F. SCHWERDTLE et al., Z. Pflanzenkr. Pflanzenschutz, (19810000), pages 431 - 440 | - J. Chem. Soc. Per-kin Trans., (19920000), vol. 1, pages 1525 - 1529 | - Pesticide Manual, (20080000), vol. 5.2 | - McCutcheon's, Vol.1: Emulsifiers & Detergents, McCutcheon's Directories, (20080000), vol. 1 | - COLBY, S. R., "Calculating Synergistic and Antagonistic Responses in Herbicide Combinations", Weeds, (19670000), vol. 15, pages 21 - 22 | other | US4265654 | US2008146837 | WO2009141367 | WO2010067895 | WO2013020985 | US8426342 | WO2016085793 | - Yuguo Z., "Progresses in Biosynthesis of L-Phosphinothricin", (20090101), URL: https://www.semanticscholar.org/paper/Progresses-in-Biosynthesis-of-L-Phosphinothricin-Yuguo/92b15ad7e4c39a3ac1ea4e9f0cfc4f6d953942c5, XP055897503 | - Ruhland et al., "Distribution and metabolism of D/L-, L- and D-glufosinate in transgenic, glufosinate-tolerant crops of maize (Zea mays L ssp mays) and oilseed rape (Brassica napus L var napus)", Pest Management Science, (20040701), vol. 60, no. 7, doi:10.1002/ps.857, ISSN 1526-498X, pages 691 - 696, XP055415713 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ps.857 | - Carbonari Caio A.; Latorre Débora O.; Gomes Giovanna L.; Velini Edivaldo D.; Owens Daniel K.; Pan Zhiqiang; Dayan Franck E., "Resistance to glufosinate is proportional to phosphinothricin acetyltransferase expression and activity in LibertyLink®and WideStrike®cotton", Planta, Springer Berlin Heidelberg, Berlin/Heidelberg, Berlin/Heidelberg, (20160105), vol. 243, no. 4, doi:10.1007/s00425-015-2457-3, ISSN 0032-0935, pages 925 - 933, XP035655626 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00425-015-2457-3 |