EP3578374 - POWDER FILM FORMING METHOD AND POWDER FILM FORMING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 04.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | New entry: Payment of renewal fee | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Hitachi Zosen Corporation 7-89, Nanko-kita 1-chome Suminoe-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 559-8559 / JP | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIURA, Sousuke c/o HITACHI ZOSEN CORPORATION 7-89 Nanko-Kita1-chome Suminoe-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 559-8559 / JP | 02 /
SUGIYO, Takeshi c/o HITACHI ZOSEN CORPORATION 7-89 Nanko-Kita1-chome Suminoe-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 559-8559 / JP | 03 /
FUKUI, Hideyuki c/o HITACHI ZOSEN CORPORATION 7-89 Nanko-Kita1-chome Suminoe-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 559-8559 / JP | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 18747116.4 | 05.02.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018JP03840 | Procedural language | EN | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 04.09.2023 | Date of request for unitary effect [2023/41] | 08.09.2023 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2023/41] | 08.09.2023 | Date of registration [2023/41] | 30.08.2023 | Date of legal effect [2023/41] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 08.09.2023 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2023/41] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3578374 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Renewal fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2024 | Renewal fee unitary effect year 07 |