EP3582878 - SORBENT DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Change: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 29.03.2024 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calgon Carbon Corporation 3000 GSK Drive Moon Township, PA 15108 / US | [2019/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREENBANK, Michael 5010 Park Drive Monaca, Pennsylvania 15061 / US | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2019/52] | Application number, filing date | 18747368.1 | 31.01.2018 | [2019/52] | WO2018US16213 | Priority number, date | US201762452704P | 31.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762452704 P | [2019/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018144588 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3582878 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/02, B01D53/04, B01D53/14, B67D7/04, // B01J20/20, B01J20/28 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
B01D53/0415 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D53/02 (EP,US);
B01D53/14 (CN);
B01J20/20 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J20/28011 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J20/2803 (CN);
B01J20/28035 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J20/2804 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B60K15/035 (CN);
B60K15/073 (CN);
B67D7/0476 (CN,KR,US);
F02M25/0854 (CN,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D2253/34 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D2257/702 (EP,CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/52] | B01D53/02, B01D53/04, B01D53/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] | Title | German: | SORPTIONSMITTELVORRICHTUNGEN | [2019/52] | English: | SORBENT DEVICES | [2019/52] | French: | DISPOSITIFS SORBANTS | [2019/52] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 31.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/16] | 08.03.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.04.2024 | 12.04.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6472343 (MCCRAE PETER D A [US], et al) [Y] 9 * figures 2-3 *; | [XYI]US7077891 (JAFFE STEPHEN MOSHEIM [US], et al) [X] 11,12,14,16 * figures 4-5 * [Y] 15,21 [I] 13; | [X]US2006205830 (LEBOWITZ JEFFREY I [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,10-12,14,16,17,19,20,22 * figures 4-6 * * table 3 * * paragraph [0037] *; | [Y]US2007272080 (ALLEN CHRISTOPHER D [US], et al) [Y] 18,21* paragraph [0003] *; | [Y]WO2013083992 (UNIV WARWICK [GB]) [Y] 8,15 * page 4, lines 8-14 *; | [XYI]US2016271555 (HILTZIK LAURENCE H [US], et al) [X] 2,4,5,17 * figure 11 * [Y] 8,9,18 [I] 3,6 | International search | [A]US3730158 (AMAND J) [A] 1-33, 35-45* entire document *; | [Y]US5897779 (WISTED ERIC E [US], et al) [Y] 36-40, 45 * entire document *; | [Y]US6406523 (CONNOR DENIS J [CA], et al) [Y] 6 * entire document *; | [A]US2004197612 (KEEFER BOWIE G [CA], et al) [A] 1-33, 35-45 * entire document *; | [XY]US7077891 (JAFFE STEPHEN MOSHEIM [US], et al) [X] 16, 19, 20, 23-25 * entire document * [Y] 15, 17, 18, 21, 22, 31-33, 35, 42, 44; | [Y]US2007272080 (ALLEN CHRISTOPHER D [US], et al) [Y] 27, 28, 31-33, 35, 44 * entire document *; | [Y]US8632334 (KNUEPPEL HARALD [CA], et al) [Y] 40 * entire document *; | [Y]US8888901 (KIMOTO JUNYA [JP]) [Y] 41-45 * entire document *; | [XY]US2016271555 (HILTZIK LAURENCE H [US], et al) [X] 1-5, 7-14, 26, 29, 30 * entire document * [Y] 6, 15, 17, 18, 21, 22, 27, 28, 36-41, 43, 45 |