EP3579902 - DEVICES AND CONTROL SYSTEMS FOR INHALED DRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hansen, Brian 9884 W. County Road 32C Loveland, CO 80538-9666 / US | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2023/23] |
Former [2019/51] | Aros Patent AB Box 1544 751 45 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 18747530.6 | 04.02.2018 | [2019/51] | WO2018US16776 | Priority number, date | US201762454843P | 05.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762454843 P | [2019/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018144964 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3579902 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3579902 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00, A61M16/00, A24F40/485, A24F40/50, A24F40/60 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
A61M15/009 (EP,US);
A24F40/485 (EP,US);
A24F40/50 (EP,US);
A24F40/60 (EP,US);
A61K31/465 (US);
A61K31/498 (US);
A61M15/0016 (EP);
A61M15/0066 (US);
A61M15/008 (EP,US);
A24F40/20 (EP,US);
A61M11/042 (EP);
A61M16/202 (EP);
A61M2016/0024 (EP);
A61M2202/064 (US);
A61M2205/3331 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,US);
A61M2205/36 (US);
A61M2205/3653 (EP);
A61M2205/50 (US);
A61M2205/502 (EP,US);
A61M2205/52 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/47] | A61M15/00, A61M16/00 | ||
Former IPC [2019/51] | A61M16/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND STEUERUNGSSYSTEME FÜR INHALIERTE ARZNEIMITTEL | [2019/51] | English: | DEVICES AND CONTROL SYSTEMS FOR INHALED DRUGS | [2019/51] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET SYSTÈMES DE COMMANDE POUR MÉDICAMENTS INHALÉS | [2019/51] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 11.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2023 | CZ | 07.06.2023 | DK | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | IT | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | NL | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | PT | 09.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9215353 (MIRIS MEDICAL CORP [US]) [I] 1-15 * page 4, line 30 - page 11, line 15 * * page 31, line 9 - page 41, line 21 * * page 49, line 27 - page 55, line 26 * * figures 1-3 *; | [I]WO9501137 (VOGES INNOVATION PTY LTD [AU], et al) [I] 1,9-15 * page 1, line 12 - page 3, line 18 * * page 5, line 10 - page 6, line 20 * * page 17, line last - page 19, line 15 * * page 21, line 5 - page 23, line 15 ** figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [I]WO2014068504 (SOUTH OSTRICH LTD [IL]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0022] - [0028] - [0034] - [0037] - [0056] * * paragraphs [0081] - [0094] - [0098] - [0105] * * figures 2A,2B,3,4,7-11 *; | [I]WO2016001923 (SYQE MEDICAL LTD [IL]) [I] 1-15 * page 16, line 7 - page 19, line 3 * * page 51, line 20 - page 52, line 16 * * page 82, lines 15-31 * * page 85, line 21 - page 86, line 27 * * page 89, line 1 - page 90, line 21 * * figures 9,10,12 * | International search | [A]US2003200964 (BLAKLEY DANIEL ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-20* , entire document. *; | [Y]US2004050383 (COX KENNETH A [US], et al) [Y] 9-13 * , para [0032], [0033]. *; | [A]US2005056276 (SCHULER CARLOS A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document. *; | [A]US2008173301 (DEATON DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document. *; | [Y]US2014305429 (LEWIS DAVID ANDREW [IT]) [Y] 3, 17 * , para [0034]-[0036], [0065]. *; | [XY]US2015040899 (SPANDORFER MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 4-8, 14-16, 18-20 * , para [0030]-[0031], [0035], [0037]-[0039]. [0043], [0045], [0047], [0057]-[0058]. * [Y] 3, 8-13, 17 | Examination | WO2004011068 | WO2006044278 |