EP3557460 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING BIOSENSOR LINKED WITH DISPLAY BY USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAEK, Seunggeol No. 119-604 363 Hyowon-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16543 / KR | 02 /
SONG, Kyunghoon No. 503-1404 37 Heungdeok 1-ro 79beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16953 / KR | 03 /
CHO, Gyusang No. 611-302 54 Naejeong-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13607 / KR | 04 /
JIN, Yunjang No. 202-804 15 Suji-ro 113beon-gil Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16849 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Kwangsub No. 602-303 14-30 Jukjeon-ro 27beon-gil Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16898 / KR | 06 /
JANG, Seyoung No. 1207-1302 165 Seopangyo-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13472 / KR | 07 /
SHIN, Heungsik No. 114-1505 274-22 Saeun-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17088 / KR | 08 /
CHO, Chihyun No. 602-402 11-22 Seocheondong-ro 21beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17106 / KR | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/09] |
Former [2019/43] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18747551.2 | 30.01.2018 | [2019/43] | WO2018KR01281 | Priority number, date | KR20170013731 | 31.01.2017 Original published format: KR 20170013731 | [2019/43] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018143643 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3557460 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3557460 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/32, G06F3/041, G06F21/45, G06F3/0354, G06F3/0488, H04W12/00, H04W12/06, H04W12/68, H04M1/725, G06K9/00, G06F1/16 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
G06F1/1626 (EP);
G06F21/32 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/041 (US);
G06F1/1637 (EP);
G06F1/1684 (EP);
G06F21/45 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0304 (US);
G06F3/0412 (US);
G06F3/0414 (KR);
G06F3/04142 (EP);
G06F3/0416 (KR,US);
G06F3/0487 (US);
G06F3/04883 (EP);
G06V10/141 (US);
G06V40/10 (KR);
G06V40/1318 (EP,US);
G06V40/1365 (US);
G06V40/67 (US);
H04M1/725 (EP);
H04W12/06 (EP);
H04W12/68 (EP);
G06F2200/1634 (US);
G06F2203/04105 (EP,US);
H04M2201/34 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/45] | G06F21/32, G06F3/041, H04M1/725, G06K9/00, G06F21/45, G06F3/0354, G06F3/0488, H04W12/00, H04W12/06 | ||
Former IPC [2019/43] | G06F21/32, G06F3/041, H04M1/725, G06K9/00, G06F21/45 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES MIT EINER ANZEIGE VERBUNDENEN BIOSENSORS UNTER VERWENDUNG DERSELBEN | [2019/43] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING BIOSENSOR LINKED WITH DISPLAY BY USING SAME | [2019/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE BIO-CAPTEUR CONNECTÉ À UN AFFICHAGE À L'AIDE DE CELUI-CI | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2019 | Translation filed | 16.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 17.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.03.2022 | AT | 02.03.2022 | CZ | 02.03.2022 | DK | 02.03.2022 | EE | 02.03.2022 | ES | 02.03.2022 | FI | 02.03.2022 | HR | 02.03.2022 | IT | 02.03.2022 | LT | 02.03.2022 | LV | 02.03.2022 | MC | 02.03.2022 | NL | 02.03.2022 | PL | 02.03.2022 | RO | 02.03.2022 | RS | 02.03.2022 | SE | 02.03.2022 | SI | 02.03.2022 | SK | 02.03.2022 | SM | 02.03.2022 | BG | 02.06.2022 | NO | 02.06.2022 | GR | 03.06.2022 | IS | 02.07.2022 | PT | 04.07.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/35] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 02.03.2022 | |
NO | 02.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2219136 (VALIDITY SENSORS INC [US]) [A] 1,4-9,12-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0014]; figure 1 ** paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044] *; | [A]US2013135247 (NA JUN KYUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1,4-9,12-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0056]; figure 5 *; | [XYI]US2015220767 (YOON SU-HA [KR], et al) [X] 1,8,9,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0059]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0121]; figures 3A - 7C * [Y] 2,6,10,13 [I] 3-5,7,11,12,14; | [YA]US2015235098 (LEE HANSOL [KR], et al) [Y] 6,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0057]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0064]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0079]; figures 5a, 5b, 6a, 6b * [A] 1-5,7-12,14,15; | [YA]EP3073792 (XIAOMI INC [CN]) [Y] 2,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0068]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0129]; figure 13 * [A] 1,3-9,11-15 | International search | [Y]KR20100094382 (VALIDITY SENSORS INC [US]) [Y] 7, 14 * See paragraphs [0021]-[0033]; and figures 3, 9. *; | [Y]KR20130057637 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0027]-[0053]; claims 1-8; and figures 2-6. *; | [Y]KR20150073539 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0013]-[0066]; claim 4: and figures 1, 5a-5c, 7a-8b, 10. *; | [Y]KR20150129383 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 6, 13 * See paragraphs [0016]-[0092], [0130]-[0185]; and figures 1-3, 7, 11, 16, 17. *; | [A]KR20160141180 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0033]-[0068]; and figures 3, 4. * |