EP3471276 - LDPC CODE TRANSMISSION METHOD USING ROW-ORTHOGONAL STRUCTURE, AND DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2019/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Jongwoong IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Bonghoe IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jinwoo IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
BYUN, Ilmu IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2019/16] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2019/16] | Application number, filing date | 18747748.4 | 05.02.2018 | [2019/16] | WO2018KR01505 | Priority number, date | US201762455478P | 06.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762455478 P | US201762518609P | 13.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762518609 P | [2019/16] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018143743 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3471276 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/11, H03M13/03, H04L1/00 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
H03M13/036 (EP);
H03M13/1162 (KR);
H03M13/116 (EP,US);
H03M13/1188 (EP);
H03M13/35 (KR);
H03M13/616 (EP,US);
H03M13/618 (EP);
H03M13/6306 (EP);
H03M13/6362 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/16] | H03M13/11, H03M13/00, H03M13/35 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Title | German: | LDPC-CODE-ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN MIT ZEILENORTHOGONALER STRUKTUR UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2019/16] | English: | LDPC CODE TRANSMISSION METHOD USING ROW-ORTHOGONAL STRUCTURE, AND DEVICE THEREFOR | [2019/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE CODE LDPC FAISANT APPEL À UNE STRUCTURE ORTHOGONALE EN RANGÉE, ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2019/16] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2019 | Translation filed | 08.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 05.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.12.2023 | 21.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/13] | 21.11.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/13] | 12.12.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2091171 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-8* figures 2,3,5 *; | [E]EP3567731 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [E] 1-8 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1,2,3a,5,6,7 *; | [XI] - ZTE ET AL, "Compact LDPC design for eMBB", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20170116 - 20170120, (20170120), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1701473 COMPACT LDPC DESIGN FOR EMBB R1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1701/Docs/, (20170120), XP051222469 [X] 1-4 * pages 2,3 * * page 10 - page 13 * [I] 5-8 | [XPI] - MEDIATEK INC, "Multi-codebook embedded compact QC-LDPC designs", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20170403 - 20170407, (20170404), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1706175_MULTI-CODEBOOK EMBEDDED COMPACT QC-LDPC DESIGNS_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS C, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_88b/Docs/, (20170404), XP051252463 [XP] 1-4 * page 1 * * page 5 - page 8 * * figure 7 * [I] 5-8 | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS, "LDPC Codes Design for eMBB data channel", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20170116 - 20170120, (20170110), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1700518_LDPC CODES DESIGN FOR EMBB_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1701/Docs/, (20170110), XP051202940 [A] 1-8 * page 2; figure 1 * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Discussion on LDPC Code Design", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20170116 - 20170120, (20170110), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1700976_DISCUSSION ON LDPC CODE DESIGN, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1701/Docs/, (20170110), XP051203268 [A] 1-8 * pages 1,2 * * page 6 - page 7; figure 5 * | [A] - MEDIATEK HUAWEI HISILICON CATT CATR ZTE LG ITRI, "Way Forward on LDPC Comparisons", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20170116 - 20170120, (20170120), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1701469_WF_ON_LDPC COMPARISONS_V2, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1701/Docs/, (20170120), XP051222466 [A] 1-8 * page 3 * | International search | [A]US2010023838 (SHEN BA-ZHONG [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0136]-[0149]; and figures 8-11. *; | [A]US2011029835 (LI ZONGWANG [US], et al) [A] 1-16* See paragraphs [0020]-[0026]; and figures 2, 3. *; | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS, "LDPC Codes Design for eMBB Data Channel", R1 -1700518, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 NR ad-hoc, Spokane, USA, (20170110), XP051202940 [A] 1-16 * See section 2; and figure 1. * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Discussion on LDPC Code Design", R1-1700976, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 NR ad-hoc, Spokane, USA, (20170110), XP051203268 [A] 1-16 * See sections 2-3.1; and figures 1, 5. * | [A] - CATT, "Optimization on Adjacent Offsets of QC-LDPC Codes", R1-1700239, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 NR ad-hoc, Spokane, USA, (20170110), XP051202742 [A] 1-16 * See section 2. * |