EP3579601 - USER APPARATUS, AND PREAMBLE TRANSMISSION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/50] | USER DEVICE AND PREAMBLE TRANSMISSION METHOD | ||
[2023/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2019/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHARA, Tomoya c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
HARADA, Hiroki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/50] | Application number, filing date | 18748170.0 | 01.02.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018JP03494 | Priority number, date | JP20170019142 | 03.02.2017 Original published format: JP 2017019142 | [2019/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018143375 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3579601 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3579601 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, // H04W16/28 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP,US);
H04W56/001 (US);
H04L43/16 (US);
H04W52/36 (US);
H04W16/28 (EP);
H04W74/0891 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/50] | H04W16/28, H04W74/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG UND PRÄAMBELÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/50] | English: | USER APPARATUS, AND PREAMBLE TRANSMISSION METHOD | [2023/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'UTILISATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE PRÉAMBULE | [2019/50] |
Former [2019/50] | USER DEVICE AND PREAMBLE TRANSMISSION METHOD | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2019 | Translation filed | 27.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 01.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23192152.9 / EP4255009 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2023 | CZ | 04.10.2023 | EE | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 05.01.2024 | |
IS | 04.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US9331767 (THOMAS TIMOTHY [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * figures 4,5 * * column 14, line 49 - column 18, line 35 * [Y] 2,3 [I] 4; | [Y] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "Discussion on 4-step random access procedure for NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20170116 - 20170120, (20170116), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1700614_DISCUSSION ON 4-STEP RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURE FOR NR_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOL, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170116), XP051208141 [Y] 2,3 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2015041818 (NTT DOCOMO INC) [A] 1-6* , . *; | [Y]WO2016022235 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [Y] 1-6 * , Claims 1, 7 & JP 2017-531352 A, 1, 7 & US 2016/0044517 A1 & CN 106575987 A & KR 10-2017-0039664 A *; | [Y]JP2016140068 (ASUSTEK COMP INC) [Y] 1, 2, 6 * , *; | [Y] - "Discussion on 4-step random access procedure for NR[ online", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 adhoc_NR_AH_1701 Rl-1700614, (20170116), XP051208141 [Y] 1-6 * , Section 2 * | by applicant | JP2017019142 |