EP3577382 - SYSTEM WITH CONDUIT SQUEEZE RETAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/50] | SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR CONDUIT SQUEEZE RETAINER | ||
[2022/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westlake Pipe & Fittings Corporation Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, County of New Castle, DE 19801 / US | [2023/26] |
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states North American Pipe Corporation 2801 Post Oak Blvd. Suite 600 Houston, TX 77056 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLAPPER, Joshua, E. 115 Taylors Mill Road Downingtown PA 19335 / US | 02 /
YASHIN, Dmitry 3542 Darby Road Haverford PA 19041 / US | 03 /
DEAN, Roy, L. 302 Village Drive Schwenksville PA 19473 / US | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [2022/52] |
Former [2019/50] | Best, Michael, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18748248.4 | 02.02.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018US16689 | Priority number, date | US201762453901P | 02.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762453901 P | US201762459040P | 14.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762459040 P | US201762560045P | 18.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762560045 P | US201815882696 | 29.01.2018 Original published format: US201815882696 | US201815882726 | 29.01.2018 Original published format: US201815882726 | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018144902 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3577382 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3577382 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16L21/02, F16L21/00, F16L21/03, F16L25/00, F16L37/14, F16L39/00, F16L37/088 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
F16L37/088 (EP,US);
F16L37/0885 (EP);
F16L2201/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/50] | F16L21/02, F16L21/00, F16L21/03, F16L25/00, F16L37/14, F16L39/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM MIT LEITUNGSQUETSCHHALTERUNG | [2022/33] | English: | SYSTEM WITH CONDUIT SQUEEZE RETAINER | [2022/33] | French: | SYSTÈME AVEC ÉLÉMENT DE RETENUE DE CONDUIT PAR COMPRESSION | [2022/33] |
Former [2019/50] | SYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR LEITUNGSQUETSCHHALTERUNG | ||
Former [2019/50] | SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR CONDUIT SQUEEZE RETAINER | ||
Former [2019/50] | SYSTÈME ET APPAREIL POUR ÉLÉMENT DE RETENUE DE CONDUIT PAR COMPRESSION | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 28.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.12.2022 | CZ | 28.12.2022 | DK | 28.12.2022 | EE | 28.12.2022 | FI | 28.12.2022 | HR | 28.12.2022 | LT | 28.12.2022 | LV | 28.12.2022 | MC | 28.12.2022 | PL | 28.12.2022 | RO | 28.12.2022 | RS | 28.12.2022 | SE | 28.12.2022 | SI | 28.12.2022 | SK | 28.12.2022 | SM | 28.12.2022 | LU | 02.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | NO | 28.03.2023 | GR | 29.03.2023 | IS | 28.04.2023 | PT | 28.04.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/49] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
LU | 02.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 28.12.2022 | |
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 28.12.2022 | |
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 28.12.2022 | |
NO | 28.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2805089 (HANSEN HOWARD J); | [XAI]US3151891 (SANDERS RALPH M); | [A]US3603619 (BENGESSER KARL, et al); | [A]US3637239 (DANIEL LEONARD IRVING); | [XA]US6305889 (BLESSING MATHIAS [AT], et al); | [XI]US2009256354 (ULLRICH MARKUS [DE], et al) | International search | [X]US6062611 (PERCEBOIS ALAIN [FR], et al); | [A]US2010001515 (SUZUKI HIDEO [JP]); | [A]US2011278835 (KISHI SHOZO [JP], et al); | [A]US2014191504 (WU YIJUN [CN]) | by applicant | US2805089 | US3151891 | US5662360 | US6305889 | US7284310 | US7537248 | US2009256354 |