EP3578603 - RESIN COMPOSITION AND MOLDED BODY FORMED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 2-1, Yaesu 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0028 / JP | [2023/18] |
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7122 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANAYA, Hirotaka c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 02 /
KAWABE, Kuniaki c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Yosuke c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 04 /
MATSUNAGA, Koji c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0265 / JP | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/50] | Application number, filing date | 18748316.9 | 23.01.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018JP01911 | Priority number, date | JP20170018924 | 03.02.2017 Original published format: JP 2017018924 | [2019/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018143002 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3578603 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08L27/06, C08L21/00, C08L27/24, C08L27/04, C08L25/02 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
C08L27/24 (EP);
C08L27/06 (KR,US);
C08L21/00 (KR);
C08L27/04 (EP);
C08L33/00 (KR);
C08L83/00 (KR);
C08L9/00 (KR,US);
B29C45/0001 (US);
B29K2027/06 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L27/04, C08L21/00, C08L25/02 (EP);
C08L27/04, C08L9/06, C08L25/02 (EP);
C08L27/24, C08L25/02, C08L51/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/50] | C08L27/06, C08L5/00, C08L21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Title | German: | HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND DARAUS GEFORMTER FORMKÖRPER | [2019/50] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION AND MOLDED BODY FORMED THEREFROM | [2019/50] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE, ET CORPS MOULÉ FORMÉ À PARTIR DE CELLE-CI | [2019/50] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2019 | Translation filed | 31.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 15.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/38] | 02.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPH05132598 (TOSOH CORP) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [I]JP2001003008 (TOYO CHEMICALS CO LTD) [I] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]JP2003147141 (KASEI CO C I) [X] 1,3-5,7 * Comparative example; paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0023] * | International search | [A]JPS4226936B [A] 1-10 * , *; | [A]JPS5035256 [A] 1-10* , *; | [A]JPS6178870 (HAYAKAWA RUBBER) [A] 1-10 * , *; | [A]JPH0485353 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD) [A] 1-10 * , - *; | [A]JPH0578537 (TOSOH CORP) [A] 1-10 * , *; | [X]JPH05132598 (TOSOH CORP) [X] 1-10 * , *; | [X]JP2001003008 (TOYO CHEMICALS CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * , *; | [A]JP2004143342 (TODA KOGYO CORP) [A] 1-10; | [A]JP2005139392 (LONSEAL KOGYO KK) [A] 1-10 * , *; | [A]CN104910561 (LIANG SHENGGUANG) [A] 1-10 * , * | by applicant | JPH05132603 | JPH06228398 | JP2000204215 | JP2002284952 | JP2005194488 | JP2017018924 |