EP3577307 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR TETHERING A SUBSEA STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2024 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trendsetter Vulcan Offshore Inc. 16225 Park Ten Place Drive Suite 135 Houston, TX 77084 / US | [2019/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHER, James V. 16225 Park Ten Place Drive Suite 135 Houston, TX 77084 / US | [2024/16] |
Former [2019/50] | 01 /
MAHER, James V. 16225 Park Ten Place Drive Suite 135 Houston Texas 77084 / US | Representative(s) | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/50] | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 18748787.1 | 05.02.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018US16821 | Priority number, date | US201762454472P | 03.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762454472 P | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018144985 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3577307 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E21B19/02, E21B29/10, E21B19/08, E21B41/10, E21B33/035, E21B33/064, E21B41/00 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
E21B33/035 (EP);
E21B33/038 (EP,US);
E21B33/064 (EP,US);
E21B41/0007 (EP,US);
E21B41/04 (US);
E21B43/017 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/50] | E21B19/02, E21B29/10, E21B19/08, E21B41/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM FESTMACHEN EINER UNTERWASSERSTRUKTUR | [2019/50] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR TETHERING A SUBSEA STRUCTURE | [2019/50] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ATTACHE D'UNE STRUCTURE SOUS-MARINE | [2019/50] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 23.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US9074447 (COX BRENT [US]) [I] 1,3,5,9,10,12,15 * column 5, line 18 - line 34 * * column 8, line 46 - column 9, line 12; figures 8, 9 * [Y] 2,4,6,11,13; | [YD]US9359852 (KEBADZE ELIZBAR BUBA [GB], et al) [YD] 2,4,6,11,13 * column 12, line 18 - line 35 * * column 9, line 62 - column 10, line 4 * * column 17, line 64 - column 18, line 31 *; | [A]WO2016118019 (STATOIL PETROLEUM AS [NO]) [A] 1,10 * page 20, line 25 - page 21, line 3 ** page 22, line 4 - page 10 * | International search | [A]US2010294505 (SBORDONE ANDREA [BR], et al) [A] 1-9 * Entire document *; | [XA]US2014374115 (KEBADZE ELIZBAR BUBA [GB], et al) [X] 1, 2, 6, 7, 12, 13, 17, 18 * Entire document especially para [0065], [0700]-[0072], [0082], [0085]-[0088], [0099]-[0106], [0107] and figs. 1, 10, 18, 19, 22-24 * [A] 3-5,8-11,14-16,19; | [A]US2014374116 (KELSO GARY [GB], et al) [A] 1-19 * Entire document *; | [A]US9074447 (COX BRENT [US]) [A] 1-19* Entire document *; | [A]US9341025 (LABRUGERE PHILIPPE [FR]) [A] 1-9 * Entire document *; | [A]US2016251817 (KEBADZE ELIZBAR BUBA [GB], et al) [A] 1-9 * Entire document * |