02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
05.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
17.11.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
08.11.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
08.11.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.11.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.07.2023 |
Change - French title |
published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
13.07.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.06.2023 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
30.06.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
30.06.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
30.06.2023 |
Change - German title |
published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
30.06.2023 |
Change - French title |
published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
21.04.2023 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
21.04.2023 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
13.04.2023 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
01.04.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.10.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.06.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.10.2021 |
Change - applicant |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
17.09.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.06.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.05.2021 |
First examination report |
|
20.05.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.10.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
16.10.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
13.07.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.06.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.05.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
22.05.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
22.05.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
11.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
15.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.08.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|