EP3661369 - USE OF INOCULANTS AND ENZYMES TO INCREASE NUTRIENT RELEASE IN ANIMAL DIETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DuPont Nutrition Biosciences ApS Langebrogade 1 1411 Copenhagen K / DK | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Shukun Gunnar Hejdemans Gata 29 S-212 40 Malmo / SE | 02 /
KRAGH, Karsten Matthias Madsbjergparken 21 DK-8270 Hoejbjerg / DK | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2020/24] | Application number, filing date | 18749998.3 | 18.07.2018 | [2020/24] | WO2018US42581 | Priority number, date | US201762545062P | 14.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762545062 P | [2020/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019036143 | Date: | 21.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3661369 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A23K10/12, A23K50/10 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
A23K10/12 (EP,US);
A23K50/10 (EP,US);
C12N9/2414 (US);
C12N9/2428 (US);
C12Y302/01001 (US);
C12Y302/01003 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON IMPFSTOFFEN UND ENZYMEN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER NÄHRSTOFFFREISETZUNG IN DER TIERERNÄHRUNG | [2020/24] | English: | USE OF INOCULANTS AND ENZYMES TO INCREASE NUTRIENT RELEASE IN ANIMAL DIETS | [2020/24] | French: | UTILISATION D'INOCULANTS ET D'ENZYMES POUR AUGMENTER LA LIBÉRATION DE NUTRIMENTS DANS DES ALIMENTS POUR ANIMAUX | [2020/24] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 13.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008113418 (ALLAIN ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0026] , [ 0035] , [ 0038] *; | [A]US2015147786 (CLARKSON KATHLEEN A [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * example 15 *; | [I]WO2015128366 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [I] 1-18* page 3, line 23 - line 25; tables 1,2 *; | [A] - R. ANURADHA ET AL, "Simultaneous saccharification and fermentation of starch to lactic acid", PROCESS BIOCHEMISTRY, GB, (19991101), vol. 35, no. 3-4, doi:10.1016/S0032-9592(99)00080-1, ISSN 1359-5113, pages 367 - 375, XP055522461 [A] 1-18 * 2.2 Methods 2.2.3 SSF * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0032-9592(99)00080-1 | by applicant | - TON NU et al., "High-moisture airtight storage of barley and triticale: Effect of moisture level and grain processing on nitrogen and phosphorus solubility", Animal Feed Science and Technology, (20150000), vol. 210, doi:doi:10.1016/j.anifeedsci.2015.09.017, pages 125 - 137, XP029314946 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.anifeedsci.2015.09.017 | - LEAHY et al., "Effects of treating corn silage with alpha-amylase and (or) sorbic acid on beef cattle growth and carcass characteristics", J. Anim. Sci., (19900000), vol. 68, pages 490 - 497, XP001076631 | - NADEAU et al., "Intake, digestibility, and composition of orchard grass and alfalfa silages treated with cellulase, inoculant, and formic acid fed to lambs", J. Anim. Sci., (20000000), vol. 78, pages 2980 - 2989 | - CHRISTIANSEN et al., "The carbohydrate-binding module family 20 - diversity, structure, and function", FEBS J, (20090000), vol. 276, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1742-4658.2009.07221.x, pages 5006 - 5029, XP002669193 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1742-4658.2009.07221.x | - JANECEK et al., "Structural and evolutionary aspects of two families of non-catalytic domains present in starch and glycogen binding proteins from microbes, plants and animals", Enzyme Microb. Technol., (20110000), vol. 49, doi:doi:10.1016/j.enzmictec.2011.07.002, pages 429 - 440, XP028316918 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.enzmictec.2011.07.002 | - CUYVERS S.; DORNEZ E.; DELCOUR J. A.; COURTIN C. M., "Occurrence and functional significance of secondary carbohydrate binding sites in glycoside hydrolases", Crit. Rev. Biotechnol., (20120000), vol. 32, pages 93 - 107 |