05.07.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
02.07.2024 |
Change - representative |
|
02.07.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
02.07.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.07.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.06.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.06.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.10.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.10.2022 |
First examination report |
|
28.06.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.08.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
27.08.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
30.06.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.03.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
26.03.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
26.03.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
05.03.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.02.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.01.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.01.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.01.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.01.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
13.01.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.01.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.06.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
27.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.12.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
17.08.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|