Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019243879 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018IB54635 | 22.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11375472 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2022 | B2 | US2021258909 | 19.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018IB54635 | 22.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112313987B | Global Dossier | 05.03.2024 | B | CN112313987 | 02.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018IB54635 | 22.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3811652 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2024 | B1 | EP3811652 | 28.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018IB54635 | 22.06.2018 |