EP3673612 - METHODS FOR DATA CIPHERING AND DECIPHERING BY VARIATION OF A CHARACTERISTIC OF AN OPTICAL RADIATION, ENCODING ELEMENT AND SYSTEM. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/27] | METHODS FOR DATA CIPHERING AND DECIPHERING BY VARIATION OF A CHARACTERISTIC OF AN OPTICAL RADIATION, ENCODING ELEMENT AND SYSTEM | ||
[2023/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S-Lux GmbH Täschmattstrasse 27 6015 Luzern / CH | [2023/46] |
Former [2020/27] | For all designated states Slux Sagl Via Vincenzo Vela 3A 6826 Riva San Vitale / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PASQUALI, Alessandro 6826 Riva San Vitale / CH | [2023/46] |
Former [2020/27] | 01 /
PASQUALI, Alessandro Via Clerici 12 6826 Riva San Vitale / CH | Representative(s) | PGA S.p.A., Milano, Succursale di Lugano Via Castagnola, 21c 6900 Lugano / CH | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 18750501.1 | 11.07.2018 | [2020/27] | WO2018IB55102 | Priority number, date | CH20170000895 | 11.07.2017 Original published format: CH 8952017 | [2021/07] |
Former [2020/27] | CH20170000895 | 11.07.2017 | |
IT20170089136 | 02.08.2017 | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019012441 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3673612 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3673612 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08, H04K1/00, H04K1/04 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
H04K1/00 (EP);
H04L9/0858 (EP,US);
H04K1/04 (EP,US);
H04K1/08 (EP,US);
H04L9/0618 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/27] | H04L9/08, G02B5/30, H04K1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERSCHLÜSSELUNG UND ENTSCHLÜSSELUNG VON DATEN DURCH VARIATION EINER EIGENSCHAFT EINER OPTISCHEN STRAHLUNG, CODIERELEMENT UND SYSTEM | [2020/27] | English: | METHODS FOR DATA CIPHERING AND DECIPHERING BY VARIATION OF A CHARACTERISTIC OF AN OPTICAL RADIATION, ENCODING ELEMENT AND SYSTEM. | [2023/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE CHIFFREMENT ET DE DÉCHIFFREMENT DE DONNÉES PAR LA VARIATION D'UNE CARACTÉRISTIQUE D'UN RAYONNEMENT OPTIQUE, ÉLÉMENT DE CODAGE ET SYSTÈME | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/27] | METHODS FOR DATA CIPHERING AND DECIPHERING BY VARIATION OF A CHARACTERISTIC OF AN OPTICAL RADIATION, ENCODING ELEMENT AND SYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/27] | 03.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2020/27] | 30.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 30.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.09.2020 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0002 | 25.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2020 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 13.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/43] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 30.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.07.2020 | Decision despatched | 08.05.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 08.05.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.05.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 30.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.05.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 30.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.05.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.2022 | 31.07.2022 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 15.11.2023 | |
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HR | 15.11.2023 | |
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO0223794 (FORSKNINGSCT RISOE [DK], et al) [X] 30 * page 13, line 30 - line 35; figures 2,4 * * page 14, line 23 - page 15, line 8; figure 4 * * page 15, line 10 - line 14; figures 4,5 * [A] 1-29; | [A]WO2016188791 (ROLIC AG [CH]) [A] 1-30* paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0010] , [0014] , [0015]; figure 2 * |