EP3580713 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR BIOMETRIC TRANSACTION MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Selfiecoin, Inc. Building 77 Brooklyn Navy Yard 16th and 15th Floor Brooklyn, NY 11205 / US | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATTLE, Sharron 6330 Mighty Flotilla Avenue Las Vegas, NV 89139 / US | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/51] | Kunz, Herbert Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18750593.8 | 26.01.2018 | [2019/51] | WO2018US15520 | Priority number, date | US201762457486P | 10.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762457486 P | [2019/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018148037 | Date: | 16.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3580713 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/06, G06Q20/10, G06Q20/32, G06Q20/40, // G06K9/00 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
G06Q20/40145 (EP,US);
G06Q20/0655 (EP,US);
G06Q20/1085 (EP,US);
H04L9/50 (EP);
G06Q2220/00 (EP,US);
G06V40/172 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/51] | G06Q20/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BIOMETRISCHEN TRANSAKTIONSVERWALTUNG | [2019/51] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR BIOMETRIC TRANSACTION MANAGEMENT | [2019/51] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE GESTION DE TRANSACTIONS BIOMÉTRIQUES | [2019/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 11.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   22.03.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015348046 (BATTLE SHARRON [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] ** paragraph [0050] *; | [I]US2016162873 (ZHOU DYLAN T X [US], et al) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063] * | International search | [Y]US2015170112 (DECASTRO ERLY DALVO [US]) [Y] 1-29 * entire document especially Abstract, para [0013]-[0014], para [0030], para [0074]-[0077] *; | [Y]US2015348046 (BATTLE SHARRON [US]) [Y] 1-29 * entire document especially Abstract, para [0020], para [0045]-[0046], para [0050] *; | [A]US2016328713 (EBRAHIMI ARMIN [US]) [A] 1-29* entire document * | by applicant | US2016162873 |