EP3580165 - BEVERAGE DISPENSER FOR POST MIX BEVERAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Welbil'T Inc. 2227 Welbilt Boulevard New Port Richey, FL 34655 / US | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VEMULA, Srikar 26512 Chimney Spire Lane Wesley Chapel, FL 33544 / US | 02 /
LUNDBERG, Kenneth, L. 18314 Holland House Loop Land O'Lakes, FL 34638 / US | 03 /
BAKER, Patrick 4515 River Overlook Drive Valrico, FL 33544 / US | 04 /
HANNIFFY, Paul 8112 Maidencane Drive Trinity, FL 34655 / US | 05 /
IONESCU, Don 17317 Curry Branch Road Louisville, KY 40245 / US | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2019/51] | Application number, filing date | 18751190.2 | 08.02.2018 | [2019/51] | WO2018US17371 | Priority number, date | US201762456394P | 08.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762456394 P | [2019/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018148372 | Date: | 16.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3580165 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/14, A23L2/385, A23L2/54, A23L2/56, B01F3/04, B01F3/08, B67D1/12, // B67D1/08 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
F04B13/02 (EP,US);
B67D1/0021 (KR);
B67D1/0027 (US);
B67D1/0043 (US);
B67D1/0044 (EP,US);
B67D1/0086 (US);
B67D1/0857 (EP);
B67D1/102 (US);
B67D1/1438 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/51] | B67D1/14, A23L2/385, A23L2/54, A23L2/56, B01F3/04, B01F3/08, B67D1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Title | German: | GETRÄNKESPENDER FÜR NACHMISCHGETRÄNKE | [2019/51] | English: | BEVERAGE DISPENSER FOR POST MIX BEVERAGES | [2019/51] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE BOISSONS À POST-MÉLANGE | [2019/51] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 28.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2639724 (COHEN ABRAHAM J, et al) [Y] 8,9,13,14* column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 2 *; | [A]GB2163531 (BASS PLC) [A] 1-7 * page 2, line 71 - page 4, line 53 *; | [XAY]DE4113825 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 20 * [A] 7,10-12,15 [Y] 8,9,13,14; | [A]GB2456324 (IMI CORNELIUS [GB]) [A] 1-7 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 28 *; | [A]GB2457434 (IMI CORNELIUS [GB]) [A] 1-7 * page 5, line 12 - page 8, line 11 * | International search | [XY]US3851797 (JACOBS J) [X] 1-5, 8, 9 * entire document * [Y] 6,7; | [XY]GB2457434 (IMI CORNELIUS [GB]) [X] 1-3, 10, 12-14, 16, 19, 20 * entire document * [Y] 15, 18; | [Y]GB2163531 (BASS PLC) [Y] 6, 7 * entire document *; | [Y]GB2232228 (IMI CORNELIUS [GB], et al) [Y] 15 * entire document *; | [Y]WO2014092658 (STRNIŠA ANŽE [SI]) [Y] 18 * entire document *; | [A]GB2489953 (IMI CORNELIUS UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1-21 * entire document *; | [A]US4562013 (JEANS EDWARD L [GB]) [A] 1-21 * entire document *; | [A]US2008189078 (VOK PETER GEORGE [AU], et al) [A] 1-21 * entire document * |