EP3566914 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AUTHENTICATING VEHICLE SMART KEY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2019/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Kwanghoon c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 02 /
YANG, Ho c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
JO, Sungmin c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2019/46] | Application number, filing date | 18751705.7 | 01.02.2018 | [2019/46] | WO2018KR01397 | Priority number, date | KR20170019419 | 13.02.2017 Original published format: KR 20170019419 | [2019/46] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018147595 | Date: | 16.08.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3566914 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3566914 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/24, B60R25/10, G06F21/30, G07C9/00 | [2020/05] | CPC: |
B60R25/246 (EP);
B60R25/24 (EP,KR);
G07C9/00309 (EP,US);
B60R25/01 (US);
B60R25/10 (EP);
B60R25/1001 (KR);
B60R25/245 (US);
G06F21/30 (EP,KR);
H04L9/3226 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/46] | B60R25/24, B60R25/10, G06F21/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG EINES INTELLIGENTEN FAHRZEUGSCHLÜSSELS | [2019/46] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AUTHENTICATING VEHICLE SMART KEY | [2019/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'AUTHENTIFICATION DE CLÉ INTELLIGENTE DE VÉHICULE | [2019/46] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2019 | Translation filed | 08.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/46] | 07.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2018 | AL | 06.01.2021 | AT | 06.01.2021 | CY | 06.01.2021 | CZ | 06.01.2021 | DK | 06.01.2021 | EE | 06.01.2021 | ES | 06.01.2021 | FI | 06.01.2021 | HR | 06.01.2021 | IT | 06.01.2021 | LT | 06.01.2021 | LV | 06.01.2021 | MC | 06.01.2021 | MK | 06.01.2021 | MT | 06.01.2021 | PL | 06.01.2021 | RO | 06.01.2021 | RS | 06.01.2021 | SE | 06.01.2021 | SI | 06.01.2021 | SK | 06.01.2021 | SM | 06.01.2021 | IE | 01.02.2021 | LU | 01.02.2021 | NL | 06.02.2021 | BE | 28.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | FR | 06.03.2021 | BG | 06.04.2021 | NO | 06.04.2021 | GR | 07.04.2021 | IS | 06.05.2021 | PT | 06.05.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 01.02.2018 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
MK | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
NL | 06.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 01.02.2018 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
NL | 06.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
NL | 06.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
NL | 06.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
IT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 06.03.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
AT | 06.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
DK | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
CZ | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
PL | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1246137 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [X]US2015002266 (BRILLON ALAIN [FR], et al); | [X]US2015015367 (LIN XING PING [US]) | International search | [Y]US2006202798 (BAUMGARTNER JOSEF [AT], et al); | [A]KR101455801B (DAE DONG CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US8930045 (OMAN TODD P [US], et al); | [A]KR101533428B (PLATO CO LTD [KR]); | [XY]US2015302673 (SEIBERTS KLAUS [DE], et al) |