EP3580628 - CONTROLLED BLENDING OF BIODIESEL INTO DISTILLATE STREAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NO | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texon LP 11757 Katy Freeway, Suite 1400 Houston, TX 77079 / US | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANSHAM, Robert c/o Texon LP 11757 Katy Freeway Suite 1400 Houston, TX 77079 / US | 02 /
ROBBINS, Colin c/o Texon LP 11757 Katy Freeway Suite 1400 Houston, TX 77079 / US | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2024/03] |
Former [2019/51] | Leißler-Gerstl, Gabriele Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18751733.9 | 01.02.2018 | [2019/51] | WO2018US16358 | Priority number, date | US201762456980P | 09.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762456980 P | [2019/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018148087 | Date: | 16.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3580628 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3580628 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G05D11/13, F02D41/00, G01N21/3577, B01F35/82, G01N33/28, F02D19/00 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
G05D11/131 (EP);
C10L1/04 (US);
B01F35/2209 (US);
B01F35/82 (EP,US);
C10G7/00 (US);
C10G2300/1011 (EP,US);
C10G2400/04 (EP,US);
C10G2400/08 (EP,US);
C10L2200/0476 (US);
C10L2290/543 (US);
G01N2030/025 (US);
G01N21/3577 (EP,US);
G01N21/359 (US);
G01N30/7206 (US);
Y02E50/10 (EP);
Y02P30/20 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/49] | G05D11/13, F02D19/00, G01N21/3577, G01N33/28, F02D41/00, B01F15/04 | ||
Former IPC [2019/51] | G05D11/00, F02D19/00, G01N21/00, G01N33/28, F02D41/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTROLLIERTE MISCHUNG VON BIODIESEL IN DESTILLATSTRÖMEN | [2019/51] | English: | CONTROLLED BLENDING OF BIODIESEL INTO DISTILLATE STREAMS | [2019/51] | French: | MÉLANGE RÉGULÉ DE BIODIESEL DANS DES FLUX DE DISTILLAT | [2019/51] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 31.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NO | 17.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/32] | IS | 17.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012247003 (BAUSTIAN JAMES J [US], et al) [Y] 1 * figure 5 *; | [IY] - Allen Houtz ET AL, "The Ratio Control Architecture (https://controlguru.com/theratio- control-architecture/)", (20150409), URL: https://controlguru.com/the-ratio-control-architecture/, (20201020), XP055742095 [I] 1-7,9,13-15 * Figure "Ratio Relay with Remote Input" on page 3 and related explanation * [Y] 1,2,4 | [Y] - JULIO CESAR L ALVES ET AL, "Determination of diesel quality parameters using support vector regression and near infrared spectroscopy for an in-line blending optimizer system", FUEL, IPC SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY PRESS, GUILDFORD, GB, vol. 97, doi:10.1016/J.FUEL.2012.03.016, ISSN 0016-2361, (20120311), pages 710 - 717, (20120320), XP028423803 [Y] 1,2,4 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fuel.2012.03.016 | [Y] - ORCHARD ET AL, "Developments in biofuel processing technologies", WORLD PUMPS, ELSEVIER ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY, GB, (20070401), vol. 2007, no. 487, doi:10.1016/S0262-1762(07)70151-7, ISSN 0262-1762, pages 24 - 28, XP022022672 [Y] 1,4 * page 26 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0262-1762(07)70151-7 | [Y] - "Biofuels focus", REFOCUS, ELSEVIER, (20070101), vol. 8, no. 1, ISSN 1471-0846, pages 48 - 53, XP005904325 [Y] 1,4 * page 49 * | [Y] - M? +? F?|?systems, "MFX_4: Modular Flow CoMputer SySteM MFX_4 FaMily: the ModuleS Individual architecture", (20170101), pages 1 - 12, URL: https://www.m-f.tech/files/cto_layout/downloads/brochures/M+F%20Technologies%20GmbH_9175-0001-0044.pdf, (20201021), XP055742528 [Y] 1,4 * page 9; example 2 * | International search | [Y]US2006074256 (ALASTI PERRY [US]) [Y] 10-12 * para [0007], [0036], [0064]-[0065], [0073] *; | [Y]US2009316139 (SHRESTHA DEV SAGAR [US], et al) [Y] 3 * para [0016], [0037], [0043] *; | [YA]US2010039884 (WEATHERS WILL [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 5-12, 20-22 and 29- 31 * para [0009]. [0011], [0013]-[0014], [0019], [0023], [0043], [0045], [0048]-[00501; figures 1-5 * [A] 4, 13-19 and 23-28; | [Y]US2010313467 (LAKE MICHAEL A [US], et al) [Y] 2 * para [0002], [0008] *; | [A]US2011060497 (CUMMINGS JILL M [US], et al) [A] 23-24* para [0004] *; | [A]US2011138679 (WELLS PAUL P [US], et al) [A] 4 * (1b.06.2011) para [0070], [0144] *; | [YA]US2015053304 (HUWYLER COLIN N [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 5-12, 20-22 and 29- 31 * para [0009], [00231, [0032], [0047]-[0048], [0051]-[0052], [0054], [0060], [0063]-[0064], [0068], [0094]; figures 1A, 7 and 13-14 * [A] 4, 13-19 and 23-28; | [A]US2016047325 (AHLINDER SVEN [SE]) [A] 13-19 and 25-28 * para [0007]-[0012] * | by applicant | US2006074256 | US2009316139 | US2010039884 | US2010313467 | US2011060497 | US2011138679 | US2012247003 | US2015053304 | US2016047325 | - ALVES et al., "Determination of diesel quality parameters using support vector regression and near infrared spectroscopy for an in-line blending optimizer system", Fuel, (20120000), vol. 97, doi:10.1016/j.fuel.2012.03.016, pages 710 - 717, XP028423803 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fuel.2012.03.016 | - ORCHARD et al., "Developments in biofuel processing technologies", World Pumps, (20070400), vol. 2007, doi:10.1016/S0262-1762(07)70151-7, pages 24 - 28, XP022022672 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0262-1762(07)70151-7 | - "Biofuels focus", ORCHARD et al., ReFocus, Elsevier, vol. 8, pages 48 - 53 |