EP3579941 - ANTENNA CONTROL FOR MOBILE DEVICE COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immersive Robotics Pty Ltd 55 Barry Parade Fortitude Valley, Queensland 4006 / AU | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUCAS, Timothy Simon c/o immersive Robotics Pty Ltd 55 Barry Parade Fortitude Valley QLD 4006 / AU | 02 /
FITZGERALD, Daniel Liam c/o immersive Robotics Pty Ltd 55 Barry Parade Bowen Hills, QLD 4006 / AU | 03 /
LAMB, Rodney Ian c/o immersive Robotics Pty Ltd 55 Barry Parade Fortitude Valley QLD 4006 / AU | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2019/51] | Application number, filing date | 18751812.1 | 07.02.2018 | [2019/51] | WO2018AU50090 | Priority number, date | AU20170900390 | 08.02.2017 Original published format: AU 2017900390 | US201762461185P | 20.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762461185 P | US201762553334P | 01.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762553334 P | [2019/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018145153 | Date: | 16.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3579941 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 16.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/00, G06F15/00, H04B7/00, H04B7/022, H04B7/06, G09G3/00, G06F3/14, H04B17/27, H04L29/06, H04M1/725, H04W4/021, H04W4/02, H04W4/70 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
H04B7/022 (EP);
G06F3/1446 (US);
G02B27/017 (US);
G02B27/0172 (US);
G06F3/1423 (EP);
G06V20/20 (US);
G09G3/003 (EP);
H04B17/27 (EP);
H04B17/318 (EP,US);
H04B7/024 (US);
H04B7/0615 (US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04M1/72454 (EP,US);
H04W16/28 (US);
H04W4/021 (EP,US);
H04W4/023 (EP);
H04W4/70 (EP);
H04W4/80 (US);
H04W88/06 (US);
G09G2354/00 (EP);
G09G2356/00 (EP);
G09G2370/16 (EP);
H04L67/131 (EP);
H04M1/72457 (EP);
H04W4/33 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/51] | A63F13/00, G06F15/00, H04B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Title | German: | ANTENNENSTEUERUNG FÜR MOBILVORRICHTUNGSKOMMUNIKATION | [2019/51] | English: | ANTENNA CONTROL FOR MOBILE DEVICE COMMUNICATION | [2019/51] | French: | COMMANDE D'ANTENNE POUR COMMUNICATION ENTRE DISPOSITIFS MOBILES | [2019/51] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 01.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 21.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US7904117 (DOAN CHINH H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,11,15 * column 5, line 5 - column 7, line 33; figures 1-2 * * column 8, lines 17-34 * * column 2, lines 29-36 * * column 3, lines 54-65 * [Y] 3,9,12-14; | [Y]US2012206452 (GEISNER KEVIN A [US], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraphs [0052] - [0053] - [0 68] , [0 77] , [ 102] , [ 117]; figure 3A *; | [Y]US2014128032 (MUTHUKUMAR PRASAD [IN]) [Y] 12-14* paragraphs [0029] , [0 33] , [0 53]; figures 3, 4, 8 *; | [Y]US2016248995 (MULLINS BRIAN [US], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0044] , [0 52] , [0 77]; figure 1 * | International search | [XY]US7904117 (DOAN CHINH H [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 4-7, 13, 23-32, 37, 48- 51 * Abstract, lines 11 to 19 column 4, lines 5 to 20 column 5, lines 22 to 48 column 5, lines 60 column 5 to line 7 column 6, lines 16 to 33 column 7, fig 1, 2. As Above * [Y] 3, 8-12, 14-22, 33-36, 38-47; | [Y]US2016248995 (MULLINS BRIAN [US], et al) [Y] 3, 8-12, 33-36 * Abstract, fig 4, para 0019, 0038, and 0077 *; | [Y]US2012206452 (GEISNER KEVIN A [US], et al) [Y] 14-22, 38-47 * Abstract, fig 3A, para 0052, 0053, 0068, 0077, 0102 *; | [A]US2014128032 (MUTHUKUMAR PRASAD [IN]) [A] 0 * Abstract, para 0030, 0033, 0038, 0041 *; | [A]US2014022125 (ZHU LIZHONG [CA], et al) [A] 0 * Abstract, para 0023, 0030, 0041, 0057, 0097 *; | [A]US2014218236 (SADEGHI BAHAREH B [US], et al) [A] 0 * Whole document * | by applicant | US7904117 | WO2017214671 | US19380623517 | AU20160905048 |