EP3579769 - LOCALIZATION NEEDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Veran Medical Technologies, Inc. 1908 Innerbelt Business Center Drive St. Louis, MO 63144 / US | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHNMACHT, Galen 1208 Penderbrooke Court Crownsville Maryland 21032 / US | 02 /
LEE, Christopher 4100 Forest Park Ave Unit 411 St. Louis Missouri 63110 / US | 03 /
MEYER, John 15000 Madison Avenue Urbandale Iowa 50323 / US | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Forrest, Stuart WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [2019/51] | Application number, filing date | 18752027.5 | 08.02.2018 | [2019/51] | WO2018US17456 | Priority number, date | US201762456308P | 08.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762456308 P | US201762561483P | 21.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762561483 P | [2019/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018148434 | Date: | 16.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3579769 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61B90/00, A61B8/08, A61B8/12, A61B10/02, A61B34/00, A61B34/20, // A61B1/267, A61M5/158, A61B34/10 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
A61B8/0841 (EP,US);
A61M5/007 (US);
A61B10/0283 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B6/481 (US);
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
A61B1/2676 (EP,US);
A61B2034/107 (EP);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3908 (EP);
A61B2090/3925 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3933 (EP);
A61B2090/395 (EP);
A61B2090/3954 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3966 (EP,US);
A61B2090/397 (EP,US);
A61B34/25 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/51] | A61B17/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Title | German: | LOKALISIERUNGSNADEL | [2019/51] | English: | LOCALIZATION NEEDLE | [2019/51] | French: | AIGUILLE DE LOCALISATION | [2019/51] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 31.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2005277918 (SHAH KRISHAN [CA], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,7 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 5,13 [I] 2,8-12; | [XI]US2007219460 (GOLDENBERG ALEC S [US]) [X] 1-3,6 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0066]; figures 1-6 * [I] 7-10; | [XYI]US2012172857 (HARRISON ROBERT [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,6,11,12 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0065]; figures 1-6G * [Y] 5,13 [I] 7-10; | [Y]US2013296691 (ASHE WESTLEY [US]) [Y] 5,13 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040]; figures 2A, 3A-4C *; | [XI]WO2016183220 (VERAN MEDICAL TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0079]; figures 10A-11C *[I] 5 | International search | [Y]US5069665 (NG RAYMOND C [US]) [Y] 16-18* See column 1, line 23-column 3, line 38; claims 1-8; and figures 1-7. *; | [XY]US2008108971 (KLEIN JEFFREY A [US]) [X] 1-4, 7-15 * See paragraphs [0034]-[0063]; claims 1-15; and figures 1-7. * [Y] 5, 6, 16-18; | [Y]US2008294148 (GARDNER ALBERT [US]) [Y] 16-18 * See paragraphs [0017]-[0026]; claims 1-17; and figures 2-6. *; | [Y]US2013296691 (ASHE WESTLEY [US]) [Y] 5, 6, 17, 18 * See paragraphs [0001], [0036]-[0052]; claims 1-20; and figures 1-9. *; | [XY]US8690832 (RACZ NICHOLAS SANDOR [US]) [X] 1-4, 7-15 * See column 2, line 6-column 10, line 45; claims 1-9; and figures 1-3. * [Y] 5, 6, 16-18 | by applicant | US2007213688 | US2011282337 |