EP3648816 - AMBULATORY INFUSION PUMPS AND ASSEMBLIES FOR USE WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic MiniMed, Inc. 18000 Devonshire Street Northridge, CA 91325 / US | [2024/15] |
Former [2020/20] | For all designated states Medtronic MiniMed, Inc. 18000 Devonshire Street Northridge, CA 91325 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Roger E. 610 North 325 West Ivins, Utah 84738 / US | [2020/20] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2024/15] |
Former [2020/20] | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18752282.6 | 18.07.2018 | [2020/20] | WO2018IB55313 | Priority number, date | US201762528486P | 04.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762528486 P | [2020/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019008562 | Date: | 10.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3648816 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3648816 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/158, A61M5/142, A61M5/145 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
A61M5/158 (EP,US);
A61M5/14244 (US);
A61M5/14248 (EP,US);
A61M5/1452 (EP,US);
A61B17/3415 (US);
A61M2005/14252 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14268 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14506 (US);
A61M2005/1583 (EP,US);
A61M2005/1585 (EP,US);
A61M2205/18 (US);
A61M2205/3317 (US);
A61M2205/8206 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMBULANTE INFUSIONSPUMPEN UND ANORDNUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAFÜR | [2020/20] | English: | AMBULATORY INFUSION PUMPS AND ASSEMBLIES FOR USE WITH SAME | [2020/20] | French: | POMPES À PERFUSION AMBULATOIRES ET ENSEMBLES À UTILISER AVEC CELLES-CI | [2020/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 03.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 03.03.2020 | Date of receipt | 30.03.2020 | Request accepted | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 10.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007140631 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1-14* figure 15 *; | [X]WO2009101130 (UNOMEDICAL AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-14 * figures 9A, 9B, 10 *; | [X]US2014058353 (POLITIS VICTOR [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0112] - [0115]; figures 25-27 *; | [X]US2016058474 (PETERSON THOMAS H [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0144]; figures 24-33 * | by applicant | US8777901 | US8905972 | US9114208 | US2016089491 | US2016235913 |