EP3655168 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVED CONTROL OF IMPINGEMENT MIXING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carlisle Fluid Technologies, LLC 16430 N. Scottsdale Road, Suite 450 Scottsdale, Arizona 85254 / US | [2023/49] |
Former [2020/22] | For all designated states Carlisle Fluid Technologies, Inc. 16430 N. Scottsdale Road Scottsdale, Arizona 85254 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONALDSON, Eric Julius Carlisle Fluid Technologies Inc. 16430 N. Scottsdale Rd. Suite 450 Scottsdale, Arizona 85254 / US | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2020/22] | Application number, filing date | 18752361.8 | 20.07.2018 | [2020/22] | WO2018US43181 | Priority number, date | US201762535817P | 21.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762535817 P | US201816040537 | 19.07.2018 Original published format: US201816040537 | [2020/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019018820 | Date: | 24.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3655168 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3655168 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3655168 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B05B12/14, B05B7/00, B05B7/04, B05B7/16, G05D11/13, B29B7/74, B29B7/76, B05B12/00, B05B12/08, B05B12/10 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
B29B7/7615 (EP);
G05D16/028 (US);
B05B12/006 (EP,US);
B05B12/085 (EP,US);
B05B12/10 (EP,US);
B05B12/1436 (EP,US);
B05B7/02 (US);
B29B7/7404 (EP);
G05D11/132 (EP,US);
G05D16/00 (US);
B01F35/831 (EP,US);
B05B7/0018 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/22] | B05B12/14, G05D11/13, B01F15/04, B05B7/00, B05B7/04, B05B7/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERTEN STEUERUNG DER GEGENSTROMVERMISCHUNG | [2020/22] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVED CONTROL OF IMPINGEMENT MIXING | [2020/22] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET MÉTHODES DE CONTRÔLE AMÉLIORÉ DE MÉLANGE PAR IMPACT | [2020/22] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 29.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.11.2023 | CZ | 01.11.2023 | DK | 01.11.2023 | EE | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | IT | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | NL | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SE | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | PT | 01.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4703894 (FUKUTA KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [A]EP1243341 (ANEST IWATA EUROP SRL [IT]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012187145 (GOULD MARK A [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US8561921 (SHOWMAN STEVE C [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014131277 (GERHARDT GEOFF C [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document * |