EP3652365 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CRYSTALLINE LAYER IN A III-N COMPOUND BY VAN DER WAALS EPITAXY FROM GRAPHENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment le Ponant D 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOURNOT, Timotée 28 rue Félix Esclangon 38000 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
HYOT, Bérangère 9 rue du Muret 38320 Eybens / FR | 03 /
EVEN, Armelle 3 rue Charles Demange 35700 Rennes / FR | 04 /
DUSSAIGNE, Amélie 235 chemin de la Bastille 38260 Saint Hilaire de la Cote / FR | 05 /
DAUDIN, Bruno-Jules 37 chemin du Côteau 38700 La Tronche / FR | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/21] | Dupont, Jean-Baptiste GIE Innovation Competence Group 310 Avenue Berthelot 69372 Lyon Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18752572.0 | 09.07.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018FR51723 | Priority number, date | FR20170056556 | 11.07.2017 Original published format: FR 1756556 | [2020/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019012215 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3652365 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C30B25/18, C30B29/40 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
C30B25/183 (EP,US);
C23C16/303 (US);
C30B25/10 (US);
C30B29/403 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KRISTALLINEN SCHICHT IN EINER III-N-VERBINDUNG DURCH VAN-DER-WAALS-EPITAXIE AUS GRAPHEN | [2020/21] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CRYSTALLINE LAYER IN A III-N COMPOUND BY VAN DER WAALS EPITAXY FROM GRAPHENE | [2020/21] | French: | PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UNE COUCHE CRISTALLINE EN UN COMPOSE III-N PAR EPITAXIE VAN DER WAALS A PARTIR DE GRAPHENE | [2020/21] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 02.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2016085890 (INNOSYS INC [US]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-14; claims 1-7 *; | [A] - NEERAJ NEPAL ET AL, "Epitaxial Growth of III-Nitride/Graphene Heterostructures for Electronic Devices", APPLIED PHYSICS EXPRESS, JP, (20130601), vol. 6, no. 6, doi:10.7567/APEX.6.061003, ISSN 1882-0778, page 061003, XP055468950 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7567/APEX.6.061003 | by applicant | - KIM et al., "Principle of direct van der Waals epitaxy of single-crystalline films on epitaxial graphene", Nat. Comm., (20140000), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1038/ncomms5836, page 4836, XP055468472 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms5836 | - D'AVOURIS, "Graphene : synthesis and applications", Materialstoday, (20120300), vol. 15, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/S1369-7021(12)70044-5, XP055270323 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1369-7021(12)70044-5 | - KIM et al., "Principle of direct van der Waals epitaxy of single-crystalline films on epitaxial graphene", Nat. Commun., (20140000), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1038/ncomms5836, page 4836, XP055468472 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms5836 | - FERNANDEZ-GARRIDO et al., "A growth diagram for plasma-assisted molecular beam epitaxy of GaN nanocolumns on Si(lll)", J. Appl. Phys., (20090000), vol. 106, doi:doi:10.1063/1.3267151, page 126102, XP012127474 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.3267151 |