EP3668655 - PNEUMATIC SUPPLY VIA A VALVE COVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pomtava SA Rue Nonceruz 2 2732 Reconvilier / CH | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCHAND, Euphémien Rue Nonceruz 2 2732 Reconvilier / CH | 02 /
NICOLET, Aloïs Rue Nonceruz 2 2732 Reconvilier / CH | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18753125.6 | 03.08.2018 | [2020/26] | WO2018EP71094 | Priority number, date | FR20170057683 | 15.08.2017 Original published format: FR 1757683 | [2020/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019034449 | Date: | 21.02.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3668655 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3668655 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/30, B05C5/02 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
B05B1/306 (EP,US);
B05B7/0815 (US);
B05B7/1263 (US);
B05C5/0237 (US);
F16K31/363 (US);
B05B13/0431 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PNEUMATISCHE VERSORGUNG ÜBER EINEN VENTILDECKEL | [2020/26] | English: | PNEUMATIC SUPPLY VIA A VALVE COVER | [2020/26] | French: | ALIMENTATION PNEUMATIQUE PAR UN CAPOT DE VANNE | [2020/26] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 28.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | IE | 03.08.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 12.10.2023 | |
GR | 13.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR1285687 (INGERSOLL RAND CANADA) [X] 1,3* figures 3, 4 *; | [XAI]WO2013071398 (CSL SILICONES INC [CA]) [X] 1,3,6,7,10 * paragraph [0128] - paragraph [0147]; figures 7, 8, 9, 11 * [A] 2,8,9 [I] 4,5; | [X]EP2628390 (MIRRIOTER S L [ES]) [X] 1,3,6,7 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1, 2 * | Examination | US3410518 | by applicant | FR2674773 | WO2013071398 |