EP3675926 - FLOW COMMUNICATION UNIT WITH PRESERVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLENTING, Vera Pinto Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 02 /
DRUSTRUP, Jørn Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 03 /
BENGTSSON, Henrik Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 04 /
PEDERSEN, Jonas Kildegård Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2020/28] | Application number, filing date | 18753211.4 | 20.08.2018 | [2020/28] | WO2018EP72400 | Priority number, date | EP20170188590 | 30.08.2017 Original published format: EP 17188590 | [2020/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019042802 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3675926 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3675926 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/00, A61M5/24, A61M5/34, A61M5/31 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
A61M5/001 (EP,US);
A61M5/2459 (EP,US);
A61M5/2448 (US);
A61M5/345 (EP,US);
A61M2005/312 (EP);
A61M2205/3337 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 30.03.2020 | Title | German: | STRÖMUNGSKOMMUNIKATIONSEINHEIT MIT KONSERVIERUNGSMITTEL | [2020/28] | English: | FLOW COMMUNICATION UNIT WITH PRESERVATIVE | [2020/28] | French: | UNITÉ DE COMMUNICATION D'ÉCOULEMENT COMPORTANT UN AGENT DE CONSERVATION | [2023/36] |
Former [2020/28] | UNITÉ DE COMMUNICATION D'ÉCOULEMENT DOTÉE D'UN CONSERVATEUR | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 30.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.2024 | BG | 07.02.2024 | ES | 07.02.2024 | FI | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | NL | 07.02.2024 | PL | 07.02.2024 | SE | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 07.02.2024 | |
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2704773 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 11 * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraphs [0052] , [0 70] , [0 71] , [0 76] , [0 77] *; | [A]WO2015173151 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1-15* figure 1 *; | [A]US2016001014 (EILERTSEN LARS [DK], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 5a, 5b *; | [A]WO2017032599 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2 * * page 13, line 15 - line 27 *; | [A]WO2017050694 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * | by applicant | US3354881 | WO2014064100 |