EP3480855 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Electric Co., Ltd. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | [2019/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA Soichi c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | 02 /
MIYATA Hiroshi c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | [2023/38] |
Former [2019/19] | 01 /
YOSHIDA Soichi c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | ||
02 /
MIYATA Hiroshi c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2019/19] | Application number, filing date | 18754605.6 | 15.02.2018 | [2019/19] | WO2018JP05312 | Priority number, date | JP20170026386 | 15.02.2017 Original published format: JP 2017026386 | [2019/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018151227 | Date: | 23.08.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3480855 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3480855 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/739, H01L29/08, H01L29/06, H01L29/417, H01L29/40, H01L29/861, H01L29/868, H01L21/331, H01L29/423, H01L21/265, H01L29/32, H01L29/10 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
H01L29/7397 (EP,US);
H01L27/0716 (US);
H01L21/26506 (EP,US);
H01L29/0615 (EP,US);
H01L29/0696 (EP,US);
H01L29/0804 (US);
H01L29/083 (EP,US);
H01L29/0834 (EP,US);
H01L29/1004 (US);
H01L29/1095 (EP,US);
H01L29/32 (EP,US);
H01L29/404 (EP,US);
H01L29/407 (EP,US);
H01L29/417 (EP,US);
H01L29/41708 (US);
H01L29/4238 (EP,US);
H01L29/78 (US);
H01L29/861 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/36] | H01L29/739, H01L29/08, H01L29/06, H01L29/417, H01L29/40, H01L29/861, H01L29/868, H01L21/336, H01L29/423, H01L21/265, H01L29/32, H01L29/10 | ||
Former IPC [2019/19] | H01L29/78, H01L21/336, H01L29/739, H01L29/861, H01L29/868 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2019/19] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2019/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2019/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2019 | Translation filed | 01.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 05.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.2023 | CZ | 20.09.2023 | DK | 20.09.2023 | EE | 20.09.2023 | ES | 20.09.2023 | FI | 20.09.2023 | HR | 20.09.2023 | IT | 20.09.2023 | LT | 20.09.2023 | LV | 20.09.2023 | NL | 20.09.2023 | PL | 20.09.2023 | RO | 20.09.2023 | RS | 20.09.2023 | SE | 20.09.2023 | SK | 20.09.2023 | SM | 20.09.2023 | NO | 20.12.2023 | GR | 21.12.2023 | IS | 20.01.2024 | PT | 22.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
IT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 20.09.2023 | |
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012043581 (KOYAMA MASAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-17* Figs. 1-6, 18-22 and corresponding text. *; | [A]US2015021658 (LEE JAE-HOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-17 * Figs. 2-5 and corresponding text. *; | [A]US2016329323 (IWASAKI SHINYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * Figs. 1, 4 and corresponding text. *; | [XI]JP2017010975 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1 * Figs. 1, 2 and corresponding text. * [I] 4-17; | [XI]US2017018547 (NAITO TATSUYA [JP]) [X] 1 * Figs. 1-4, 9-11 and corresponding text. * [I] 4-17; | [A]US2017018636 (NAITO TATSUYA [JP]) [A] 1-17 * Figs. 1-3 and corresponding text. *; | [XPI]WO2017155122 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1,2 * Figs. 5, 6, 11 and corresponding text. * [I] 4-17; | [L]US2018182754 (NAITO TATSUYA [JP]) [L] * Figs. 5, 6, 11 and corresponding text. * | International search | [A]JP2012043890 (DENSO CORP, et al) [A] 1-17 * , entire text, all drawings & US 2012/0043581 A1 & DE 102011080891 A1 & CN 102376709 A *; | [A]JP2017010975 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [PA]WO2017099095 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-17 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [PA]WO2017141998 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-17 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [PA]WO2017155122 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-17* , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) * |