EP3652491 - PROCESS FOR LYOPHILISING A PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: AL | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 4D PHARMA LEÓN, S.L.U. Parque Technológico de León Parcela M-10.4 Armunia 24009 León / ES | [2021/19] |
Former [2020/21] | For all designated states 4D PHARMA LEÓN, S.L.U. Parque Technológico de León Parcela M-10.4 Armunia 24009 León / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARITE, Christophe 4D Pharma Plc 5th Floor Bond Court Leeds LS1 2JZ / GB | 02 /
DECLOMESNIL, Sophie 4D Pharma Plc 5th Floor Bond Court Leeds LS1 2JZ / GB | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Brand Murray Fuller LLP 50 Eastcastle Street London W1W 8EA / GB | [2021/19] |
Former [2020/21] | Marshall, Cameron John Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18755314.4 | 16.07.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018IB55246 | Priority number, date | GB20170011359 | 14.07.2017 Original published format: GB 201711359 | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019012512 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3652491 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3652491 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F26B5/06, A61J1/10 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
F26B5/06 (EP,CN,GB,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/19 (CN,IL,US);
A61K35/74 (CN,IL,US);
A61K9/48 (CN,IL,US);
B65D33/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
F26B25/002 (CN,IL,US);
F26B25/063 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
F26B25/16 (CN,IL,US);
F26B5/044 (CN,GB,IL,KR);
F26B5/10 (IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Extension states | BA | 31.01.2020 | ME | 31.01.2020 | Validation states | KH | 31.01.2020 | MA | 31.01.2020 | MD | 31.01.2020 | TN | 31.01.2020 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR LYOPHILISIERUNG EINES PRODUKTES | [2020/21] | English: | PROCESS FOR LYOPHILISING A PRODUCT | [2020/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE LYOPHILISATION DE PRODUIT | [2020/21] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 31.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21172900.9 / EP3978852 | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MT | 12.05.2021 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/44] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
MT | 12.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 12.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4035924 (FAURE JEAN-CHRISTIAN) [X] 1,3-6,17,20 * column 1, line 17 - line 26 *; | [X]US4973327 (GOODRICH JR RAYMOND P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,17-20 * column 2, line 26 - column 4, line 13; figure - *; | [XY]EP0914813 (SHINSOZAI SOGO KENKYUSHO KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,7,8,15-17,20 * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0097]; figure - * [Y] 9-11; | [X]US2008229609 (BRONSHTEIN VICTOR [US]) [X] 1,3,12-17,20 * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0112] ** paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0132] *; | [XY]US2017000738 (JOSHI-HANGAL RAJASHREE [US], et al) [X] 16 * paragraphs [0084] , [0111] * [Y] 9-11 |