Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3661380 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201880047031 CN202210610245 EP18755642 EP23213566 US2018044820W US201816028847 US202016943066



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11877603Global Dossier 23.01.2024B2
US2020352257 12.11.2020A1
Priority number Date
US202016943066 30.07.2020
US201816028847 06.07.2018
US201762540376 02.08.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4309530Global Dossier 17.04.2024A3
EP4309530 24.01.2024A2
Priority number Date
WO2018US44820 01.08.2018
US201816028847 06.07.2018
EP18755642 01.08.2018
US201762540376 02.08.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN115067583Global Dossier 20.09.2022A
Priority number Date
WO2018US44820 01.08.2018
CN201880047031 01.08.2018
US201816028847 06.07.2018
US201762540376 02.08.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN110891447BGlobal Dossier 24.05.2022B
CN110891447 17.03.2020A
Priority number Date
WO2018US44820 01.08.2018
US201816028847 06.07.2018
US201762540376 02.08.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3661380Global Dossier 14.08.2024B1
EP3661380 10.06.2020A1
Priority number Date
WO2018US44820 01.08.2018
US201816028847 06.07.2018
US201762540376 02.08.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2019028147Global Dossier 07.02.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201816028847 06.07.2018
US201762540376 02.08.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US10765153Global Dossier 08.09.2020B2
US2019037930 07.02.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201816028847 06.07.2018
US201762540376 02.08.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWM576397U 11.04.2019U
Priority number Date
US201816028847 06.07.2018
US201762540376 02.08.2017
TypeType Divisional application
 EP4309530