|
10.04.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2023 |
Communication concerning a request to change bibliographic data after the decision to grant/decision to maintain the patent in a |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2023 |
Request for delayed grant (upcoming introduction of UPP) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2022 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.12.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
14.12.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
14.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.11.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.11.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2022 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.07.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
13.07.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
08.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.06.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.06.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2022 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.02.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
18.02.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
05.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.05.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.05.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.02.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2020 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2020 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.2020 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
14.02.2020 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.2020 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
14.02.2020 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.02.2020 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
03.02.2020 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
06.12.2019 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
29 |
|
04.07.2019 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.07.2019 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
04.07.2019 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2019 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) (without attachments) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.05.2019 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
28.05.2019 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
28.05.2019 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
28.05.2019 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
20 |
|
28.05.2019 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
20 |
|
28.05.2019 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.05.2019 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
31.01.2019 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.01.2019 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
07.11.2018 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
03.09.2018 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
31.08.2018 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
28.08.2018 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
20 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |