12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
12.04.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
15.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
17.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
16.06.2023 |
Correction of patent specification |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
26.05.2023 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] |
24.05.2023 |
New entry: Request filed for correction of the decision to grant |
|
05.05.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
01.03.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
28.02.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.02.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.12.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.11.2022 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
22.07.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.07.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.06.2022 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
17.02.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.07.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.05.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.02.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.02.2021 |
First examination report |
|
02.10.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] |
02.10.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] |
17.07.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.05.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
01.05.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
01.05.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
10.04.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
15.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.08.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|