EP3658224 - A PULSE GENERATING DEVICE FOR DELIVERY OF ELECTRICAL PULSES TO A DESIRED TISSUE OF A MAMMAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 20.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Payment of renewal fee | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Scandinavian ChemoTech AB Scheeletorget 1 223 63 Lund / SE | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRICK, Mohan 740614 9299 Skatteverket Förmedlingsuppdrag Box 2820 403 20 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
PERSSON, Bertil RR Angantyrsgränd 19 224 75 Lund / SE | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 18755724.4 | 27.07.2018 | [2020/23] | WO2018EP70446 | Procedural language | EN | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 20.06.2023 | Date of request for unitary effect [2023/30] | 27.06.2023 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2023/30] | 27.06.2023 | Date of registration [2023/30] | 07.06.2023 | Date of legal effect [2023/30] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 27.06.2023 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2023/30] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3658224 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3658224 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | [2023/29] | Renewal fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2023 | Renewal fee unitary effect year 06 | 09.07.2024 | Renewal fee unitary effect year 07 |