EP3676057 - ROBOT AND METHOD FOR RETRIEVAL OF A TARGET ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Movebot ApS Amager Strandvej 184 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLINGE, Thomas, Martin Vrold Tværvej 19 8660 Skanderborg / DK | 02 /
KASSOW, Kristian Edvard Thomsens Vej 33 4. th 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | COPA Copenhagen Patents Rosenørns Allé 1, 2nd floor 1970 Frederiksberg C / DK | [2020/28] | Application number, filing date | 18755849.9 | 24.08.2018 | [2020/28] | WO2018EP72920 | Priority number, date | EP20170188842 | 31.08.2017 Original published format: EP 17188842 | EP20170203274 | 23.11.2017 Original published format: EP 17203274 | [2020/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019042898 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3676057 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3676057 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16, B25J11/00, B25J15/00, B25J19/02, B65G59/00, B65G60/00, B65G61/00, B65G1/04, B25J5/00, B25J9/10 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
B25J9/1687 (EP);
B65G1/0435 (EP,US);
B25J11/008 (EP);
B25J15/00 (EP,US);
B25J19/021 (EP,US);
B25J5/007 (EP,US);
B25J9/0096 (US);
B25J9/107 (EP,US);
B25J9/1633 (US);
B65G1/0421 (EP,US);
B65G59/00 (EP,US);
B65G61/00 (EP,US);
B66F9/0755 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/28] | B25J9/16, B25J11/00, B25J15/00, B25J19/02, B65G59/00, B65G60/00, B65G61/00, B65G1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROBOTER UND VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG EINES ZIELARTIKELS | [2020/28] | English: | ROBOT AND METHOD FOR RETRIEVAL OF A TARGET ARTICLE | [2020/28] | French: | ROBOT ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCUPÉRATION D'UN ARTICLE CIBLE | [2020/28] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 05.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.08.2018 | AL | 13.10.2021 | AT | 13.10.2021 | CY | 13.10.2021 | CZ | 13.10.2021 | EE | 13.10.2021 | ES | 13.10.2021 | FI | 13.10.2021 | HR | 13.10.2021 | IT | 13.10.2021 | LT | 13.10.2021 | LV | 13.10.2021 | MC | 13.10.2021 | MK | 13.10.2021 | NL | 13.10.2021 | PL | 13.10.2021 | RO | 13.10.2021 | RS | 13.10.2021 | SE | 13.10.2021 | SI | 13.10.2021 | SK | 13.10.2021 | SM | 13.10.2021 | TR | 13.10.2021 | BG | 13.01.2022 | NO | 13.01.2022 | GR | 14.01.2022 | IS | 13.02.2022 | PT | 14.02.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 24.08.2018 | |
AL | 13.10.2021 | ||
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CY | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
MK | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 24.08.2018 | |
AL | 13.10.2021 | ||
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CY | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CY | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 13.01.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1001645 (DONALD MAYER KING) [A] 1-15* figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US3187917 (MILLER WENDELL S) [A] 1-15 * figures 7-9 *; | [A]US3447697 (MOREY WOODRUFF A, et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 19-27 * * column 12, line 42 - line 51 * * column 15, line 46 - line 56 * * column 13, line 8 - line 10 *; | [A]WO9402390 (STAEGE RUEDIGER [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2015074755 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figures 25-30 * |