EP3678859 - PLANT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CORRUGATED CARDBOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUANTUMCORRUGATED S.R.L. Via Torino, 61 20123 Milano / IT | [2021/32] |
Former [2020/29] | For all designated states BP Agnati S.r.L. Via Lecco, 72 20871 Vimercate (MB) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRIVIO, Piero Alberto 38 Viale B. Costa 16038 Santa Margherita Ligure (GE) / IT | 02 /
ROSSI, Renato 20, Via Leopardi 20853 Biassono (MB) / IT | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Pistolesi, Roberto, et al Dragotti & Associati S.r.l. Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [2021/34] |
Former [2020/29] | Corradini, Corrado, et al Ing. C. Corradini & C. S.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri 4 42121 Reggio Emilia / IT | Application number, filing date | 18755922.4 | 31.07.2018 | [2020/29] | WO2018IB55730 | Priority number, date | IT20170099951 | 06.09.2017 Original published format: IT201700099951 | [2020/29] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019048945 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3678859 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3678859 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B31F1/28 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
B31F1/2813 (EP,US);
B31F1/2818 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WELLPAPPE | [2020/29] | English: | PLANT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CORRUGATED CARDBOARD | [2020/29] | French: | USINE DE PRODUCTION DE CARTON ONDULÉ | [2020/29] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 18.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2018 | AL | 25.08.2021 | AT | 25.08.2021 | CY | 25.08.2021 | CZ | 25.08.2021 | DK | 25.08.2021 | EE | 25.08.2021 | FI | 25.08.2021 | HR | 25.08.2021 | LT | 25.08.2021 | LV | 25.08.2021 | MC | 25.08.2021 | MK | 25.08.2021 | MT | 25.08.2021 | NL | 25.08.2021 | PL | 25.08.2021 | RO | 25.08.2021 | RS | 25.08.2021 | SE | 25.08.2021 | SI | 25.08.2021 | SK | 25.08.2021 | SM | 25.08.2021 | BG | 25.11.2021 | NO | 25.11.2021 | GR | 26.11.2021 | IS | 25.12.2021 | PT | 27.12.2021 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 31.07.2018 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
MK | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
MK | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2211216 (RENGO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 7 - page 8, line 22; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2792478 (ITALDRY S R L [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO2017036685 (FOSBER SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 5 - page 9, line 27; figures 1a-1c * |