Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3661381 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201880050826 EP18756124 US2018045166W US201816054150 US202117488902 US202418612680



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2024225168Global Dossier 11.07.2024A1
Priority number Date
US201762541495 04.08.2017
US202117488902 29.09.2021
US202418612680 21.03.2024
US201816054150 03.08.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11957201Global Dossier 16.04.2024B2
US2022015493 20.01.2022A1
Priority number Date
US201762541495 04.08.2017
US202117488902 29.09.2021
US201816054150 03.08.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11154110Global Dossier 26.10.2021B2
US2019037959 07.02.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201762541495 04.08.2017
US201816054150 03.08.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN110996704BGlobal Dossier 02.05.2023B
CN110996704 10.04.2020A
Priority number Date
US201762541495 04.08.2017
WO2018US45166 03.08.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3661381Global Dossier 30.08.2023B1
EP3661381 10.06.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201762541495 04.08.2017
WO2018US45166 03.08.2018
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2019028350Global Dossier 07.02.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201762541495 04.08.2017