EP3529804 - KEY PHRASE DETECTION WITH AUDIO WATERMARKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARCIA, Ricardo Antonio 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Anderson, Oliver Ben, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2019/35] | Application number, filing date | 18756127.9 | 03.08.2018 | [2019/35] | WO2018US45185 | Priority number, date | US201715824183 | 28.11.2017 Original published format: US201715824183 | [2019/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019108275 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3529804 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3529804 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/00, G10L19/018, G06F21/31, // G10L15/08, H04N21/233, H04N21/8358 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
G10L19/018 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F21/31 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/165 (CN,KR,US);
G10L15/08 (CN,KR,US);
G10L15/22 (CN,KR,US);
G10L21/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/233 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/8358 (EP,KR,US);
G10L2015/088 (EP,KR,US);
G10L2015/223 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERKENNUNG VON SCHLÜSSELSÄTZEN MIT AUDIOWASSERZEICHENMARKIERUNG | [2019/35] | English: | KEY PHRASE DETECTION WITH AUDIO WATERMARKING | [2019/35] | French: | DÉTECTION DE PHRASE CLÉ AVEC FILIGRANE AUDIO | [2019/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 24.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19218608.8 / EP3664091 | EP21152004.4 / EP3828741 | EP23153016.3 / EP4202737 | Opposition(s) | 06.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.08.2018 | AL | 05.02.2020 | AT | 05.02.2020 | CY | 05.02.2020 | CZ | 05.02.2020 | DK | 05.02.2020 | EE | 05.02.2020 | ES | 05.02.2020 | FI | 05.02.2020 | HR | 05.02.2020 | IT | 05.02.2020 | LT | 05.02.2020 | LV | 05.02.2020 | MC | 05.02.2020 | MK | 05.02.2020 | MT | 05.02.2020 | NL | 05.02.2020 | PL | 05.02.2020 | RO | 05.02.2020 | RS | 05.02.2020 | SE | 05.02.2020 | SI | 05.02.2020 | SK | 05.02.2020 | SM | 05.02.2020 | TR | 05.02.2020 | BG | 05.05.2020 | NO | 05.05.2020 | GR | 06.05.2020 | IS | 05.06.2020 | PT | 28.06.2020 | IE | 03.08.2020 | LU | 03.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | [2023/41] |
Former [2022/31] | HU | 03.08.2018 | |
AL | 05.02.2020 | ||
AT | 05.02.2020 | ||
CY | 05.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
MK | 05.02.2020 | ||
MT | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
TR | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
IE | 03.08.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/30] | HU | 03.08.2018 | |
AL | 05.02.2020 | ||
AT | 05.02.2020 | ||
CY | 05.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
MT | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
TR | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
IE | 03.08.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 03.08.2018 | |
AT | 05.02.2020 | ||
CY | 05.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
MT | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
TR | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
IE | 03.08.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 05.02.2020 | |
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
IE | 03.08.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 05.02.2020 | |
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 05.02.2020 | |
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AT | 05.02.2020 | |
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 05.02.2020 | |
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
NO | 05.05.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015294666 (MIYASAKA SHUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,19,22 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] * * paragraphs [0041] , [0042]; figure 11A *; | [A]WO2016195890 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1,19,22 * paragraphs [0049] , [0050]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0022] - [0024] *; | [A]US9548053 (BASYE KENNETH JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1,19,22 * column 2, lines 5-45 * * column 10, line 54 - column 11, line 15; figure 6 *; | [AP]WO2018118002 (ROVI GUIDES INC [US]) [AP] 1,19,22* paragraph [0067] * |