EP3665353 - DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE OPENING/CLOSING OF A DOOR WING OF A PIECE OF FURNITURE AND THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/25] | DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE OPENING/CLOSING OF DOOR WINGS OF A PIECE OF FURNITURE AND THE LIKE | ||
[2023/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferramenta Livenza S.r.l. Viale Lino Zanussi 21 33070 Maron di Brugnera, Pordenone / IT | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARNELOS, Luca c/o Ferramenta Livenza S.r.l. Viale Lino Zanussi 21 33070 Maron Di Brugnera (PN) / IT | 02 /
CIOL, Mattia c/o Ferramenta Livenza S.r.l. Viale Lino Zanussi 21 33070 Maron Di Brugnera (PN) / IT | 03 /
DELLA ROSA, Simone c/o Ferramenta Livenza S.r.l. Viale Lino Zanussi 21 33070 Maron Di Brugnera (PN) / IT | 04 /
IVAN, Abramo c/o Ferramenta Livenza S.r.l. Viale Lino Zanussi 21 33070 Maron Di Brugnera (PN) / IT | 05 /
VERZIAGI, Davide c/o Ferramenta Livenza S.r.l. Viale Lino Zanussi 21 33070 Maron Di Brugnera (PN) / IT | 06 /
ZONTA, Christian c/o Ferramenta Livenza S.r.l. Viale Lino Zanussi 21 33070 Maron Di Brugnera (PN) / IT | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Giugni, Valter, et al Propria S.r.l. Via della Colonna, 35 33170 Pordenone / IT | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18756290.5 | 26.07.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018IB55601 | Priority number, date | IT20170093526 | 11.08.2017 Original published format: IT201700093526 | [2020/25] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019030598 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3665353 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3665353 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E05F1/10, E05F5/10 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
E05F1/10 (EP,US);
E05F3/10 (US);
E05F1/1058 (EP);
E05F1/1075 (EP);
E05F5/10 (EP);
E05Y2201/264 (EP);
E05Y2201/654 (EP);
E05Y2201/66 (EP);
E05Y2600/41 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DES ÖFFNENS/SCHLIESSENS VON TÜRFLÜGELN EINES MÖBELSTÜCKS UND DERGLEICHEN | [2020/25] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE OPENING/CLOSING OF A DOOR WING OF A PIECE OF FURNITURE AND THE LIKE | [2023/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'OUVERTURE/FERMETURE DE BATTANTS DE PORTE D'UN ÉLÉMENT D'AMEUBLEMENT ET ANALOGUE | [2020/25] |
Former [2020/25] | DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE OPENING/CLOSING OF DOOR WINGS OF A PIECE OF FURNITURE AND THE LIKE | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 24.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 09.08.2023 | |
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 09.08.2023 | |
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 09.08.2023 | |
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP1691016 (EFFEGI BREVETTI SRL [IT]) [AD] 1-11 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE202008002232U (KNOKE BESCHLAGTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]WO2015014814 (EFFEGI BREVETTI SRL [IT]) [A] 1-11* page 4, line 21 - page 9, line 12; figures 1-12 *; | [A]DE202017100850U (KNOKE BESCHLAGTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-10 * |