EP3631760 - NON-RIGID ALIGNMENT FOR VOLUMETRIC PERFORMANCE CAPTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2020 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOU, Mingsong 1600 Amphitheatre Pkwy. Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
FANELLO, Sean Ryan 1600 Amphitheatre Pkwy. Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 03 /
KOWDLE, Adarsh Prakash Murthy 1600 Amphitheatre Pkwy. Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 04 /
RHEMANN, Christoph 1600 Amphitheatre Pkwy. Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 05 /
KHAMIS, Sameh 1600 Amphitheatre Pkwy. Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 06 /
DAVIDSON, Philip L. 1600 Amphitheatre Pkwy. Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 07 /
IZADI, Shahram 1600 Amphitheatre Pkwy. Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 08 /
TANKOVICH, Vladimir 1600 Amphitheatre Pkwy. Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2020/15] | Application number, filing date | 18756320.0 | 25.07.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018US43626 | Priority number, date | US201762513176P | 31.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762513176 P | US201815994471 | 31.05.2018 Original published format: US201815994471 | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018223152 | Date: | 06.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3631760 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/73 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
G06T7/75 (EP,US);
G06T7/596 (US);
G06T15/08 (US);
G06T17/20 (US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10024 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHTSTARRE AUSRICHTUNG FÜR VOLUMETRISCHE LEISTUNGERFASSUNG | [2020/15] | English: | NON-RIGID ALIGNMENT FOR VOLUMETRIC PERFORMANCE CAPTURE | [2020/15] | French: | ALIGNEMENT NON RIGIDE POUR CAPTURE DE PERFORMANCE VOLUMÉTRIQUE | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 29.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.06.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y] - HAO LI ET AL, "Robust single-view geometry and motion reconstruction", ACM SIGGRAPH ASIA 2009 PAPERS ON, SIGGRAPH ASIA '09, ACM PRESS, NEW YORK, NEW YORK, USA, (20091201), doi:10.1145/1661412.1618521, ISBN 978-1-60558-858-2, pages 1 - 10, XP058103966 [Y] 1,4,5,8,9,12,13,15,16,19,20 * abstract * * figures 3,5,7,8,9,16 * * sections 4,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1661412.1618521 | [A] - INNMANN MATTHIAS ET AL, VolumeDeform: Real-Time Volumetric Non-rigid Reconstruction, MEDICAL IMAGE COMPUTING AND COMPUTER-ASSISTED INTERVENTION - MICCAI 2015 : 18TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, MUNICH, GERMANY, OCTOBER 5-9, 2015; PROCEEDINGS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHING, CH, (20160917), ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-319-24946-9, XP047362397 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * section 4 * * figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-319-46484-8_22 | [A] - MINGSONG DOU ET AL, "Fusion4D", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS (TOG), ACM, US, (20160711), vol. 35, no. 4, doi:10.1145/2897824.2925969, ISSN 0730-0301, pages 1 - 13, XP058275854 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * sections 3-5;; figures 2,7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2897824.2925969 | [Y] - TAMAL K. DEY ET AL, "Automatic posing of a meshed human model using point clouds", COMPUTERS AND GRAPHICS., GB, (20150201), vol. 46, doi:10.1016/j.cag.2014.09.018, ISSN 0097-8493, pages 14 - 24, XP055515229 [Y] 1,4,5,8,9,12,13,15,16,19,20 * abstract * * figures 2,4 * * sections 1, 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cag.2014.09.018 | [XP] - MINGSONG DOU ET AL, "Motion2fusion : real-time volumetric performance capture", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS (TOG), US, (20171120), vol. 36, no. 6, doi:10.1145/3130800.3130801, ISSN 0730-0301, pages 1 - 16, XP055515276 [XP] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/3130800.3130801 |