Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019033046 | ![]() | 14.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019032955 | ![]() | 14.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018152375 | ![]() | 27.09.2018 | A3 | WO2018152375 | 23.08.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201762543819 | 10.08.2017 | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201762583426 | 08.11.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018152326 | ![]() | 23.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018152285 | ![]() | 23.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201762543559 | 10.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024271326 | ![]() | 15.08.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217888406 | 15.08.2022 | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201916543332 | 16.08.2019 | US202418435766 | 07.02.2024 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024141058 | ![]() | 02.05.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217888406 | 15.08.2022 | US202418408477 | 09.01.2024 | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201916543332 | 16.08.2019 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024024432 | ![]() | 25.01.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US202016782669 | 05.02.2020 | WO2018US46199 | 10.08.2018 | US202318464025 | 08.09.2023 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024018253 | ![]() | 18.01.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US202318465078 | 11.09.2023 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201916543332 | 16.08.2019 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023381286 | ![]() | 30.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318166223 | 08.02.2023 | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46337 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US202016782984 | 05.02.2020 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020369746 | ![]() | 26.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US202016782669 | 05.02.2020 | WO2018US46199 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020289627 | ![]() | 17.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46337 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US202016782984 | 05.02.2020 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12162948 | ![]() | 10.12.2024 | B2 | US2024271327 | 15.08.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217888406 | 15.08.2022 | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201916543332 | 16.08.2019 | US202418435766 | 07.02.2024 | US202418643692 | 23.04.2024 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11912778 | ![]() | 27.02.2024 | B2 | US2023235072 | 27.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217888406 | 15.08.2022 | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201916543332 | 16.08.2019 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11795232 | ![]() | 24.10.2023 | B2 | US2020223935 | 16.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201916543332 | 16.08.2019 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11732023 | ![]() | 22.08.2023 | B2 | US2020262890 | 20.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762543819 | 10.08.2017 | US201815934744 | 23.03.2018 | US201916573726 | 17.09.2019 | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US18445 | 15.02.2018 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201762583426 | 08.11.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11612150 | ![]() | 28.03.2023 | B2 | US2019274291 | 12.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US18302 | 15.02.2018 | US201816165324 | 19.10.2018 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201762543559 | 10.08.2017 | US201815923928 | 16.03.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10457717 | ![]() | 29.10.2019 | B2 | US2018237496 | 23.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762543819 | 10.08.2017 | US201815934744 | 23.03.2018 | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US18445 | 15.02.2018 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201762583426 | 08.11.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10143187 | ![]() | 04.12.2018 | B2 | US2018235195 | 23.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US18302 | 15.02.2018 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201762543559 | 10.08.2017 | US201815923928 | 16.03.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102755478B | ![]() | 14.01.2025 | B1 | KR20190129868 | 20.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102637590B | ![]() | 15.02.2024 | B1 | KR20190135993 | 09.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US18302 | 15.02.2018 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201762543559 | 10.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023123757 | ![]() | 05.09.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020507090 | 10.08.2018 | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46337 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023116513 | ![]() | 22.08.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | JP2019545322 | 15.02.2018 | WO2018US18302 | 15.02.2018 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201762543559 | 10.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023100833 | ![]() | 19.07.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | JP2019545273 | 15.02.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023058568 | ![]() | 25.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762543819 | 10.08.2017 | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US18445 | 15.02.2018 | JP2019545353 | 15.02.2018 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201762583426 | 08.11.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020530465 | ![]() | 22.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46337 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7280241B | ![]() | 23.05.2023 | B2 | JP2020530293 | 22.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46199 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7669113B | ![]() | 28.04.2025 | B2 | JP2020510418 | 09.04.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US18302 | 15.02.2018 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201762543559 | 10.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7577447B | ![]() | 05.11.2024 | B2 | JP2020508053 | 19.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762543819 | 10.08.2017 | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US18445 | 15.02.2018 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201762583426 | 08.11.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020508049 | ![]() | 19.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL307373 | ![]() | 01.11.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL268660 | ![]() | 01.03.2024 | B2 | IL268660 | 01.11.2023 | B1 | IL268660 | 31.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL268659 | ![]() | 31.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US18302 | 15.02.2018 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201762543559 | 10.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4169937 | ![]() | 26.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | EP18708025 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3665194 | ![]() | 07.07.2021 | A4 | EP3665194 | 17.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46337 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3583120 | ![]() | 05.10.2022 | B1 | EP3583120 | 25.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3583119 | ![]() | 25.12.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201762543819 | 10.08.2017 | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US18445 | 15.02.2018 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201762583426 | 08.11.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3583118 | ![]() | 25.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US18302 | 15.02.2018 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201762543559 | 10.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111148757B | ![]() | 21.06.2024 | B | CN111148757 | 12.05.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46199 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111094336 | ![]() | 01.05.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46337 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110506055 | ![]() | 26.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110506054 | ![]() | 26.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762543819 | 10.08.2017 | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US18445 | 15.02.2018 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201762583426 | 08.11.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110382526B | ![]() | 26.12.2023 | B | CN110382526 | 25.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US18302 | 15.02.2018 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201762543559 | 10.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3072051 | ![]() | 14.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46337 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3072035 | ![]() | 14.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46199 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3053381 | ![]() | 23.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762543819 | 10.08.2017 | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US18445 | 15.02.2018 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201762583426 | 08.11.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3053375 | ![]() | 23.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3053370 | ![]() | 23.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US18302 | 15.02.2018 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201762543559 | 10.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021240106B | ![]() | 07.09.2023 | B2 | AU2021240106 | 28.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2018221731 | 15.02.2018 | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | AU2021240106 | 27.09.2021 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018221731C | ![]() | 18.11.2021 | C1 | AU2018221731B | 01.07.2021 | B2 | AU2018221731 | 19.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018221704B | ![]() | 19.08.2021 | B2 | AU2018221704 | 19.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US18302 | 15.02.2018 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201762543559 | 10.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3665192 | ![]() | 12.07.2023 | B1 | EP3665192 | 17.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46199 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR111048 | 29.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112019016989 | 26.05.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2019002307 | 17.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO2019008873 | 30.08.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CR20190372 | 17.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3583120T | 02.09.2024 | T5 | DK3583120T | 19.12.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3665192T | 26.08.2024 | T5 | DK3665192T | 09.10.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46199 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA201991922 | 19.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ECSP19058592 | 30.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2932759T | 25.01.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2956062T | 12.12.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46199 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI3583120T | 13.01.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI3665192T | 28.09.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46199 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20221505T | 17.02.2023 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | EP18708025 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20231118T | 22.12.2023 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46199 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | EP18756531 | 10.08.2018 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE060983T | 28.05.2023 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE063021T | 28.12.2023 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT3583120T | 27.12.2022 | T | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT3665192T | 25.10.2023 | T | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46199 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA47496 | 30.12.2022 | B1 | MA47496 | 25.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA49835 | 31.10.2023 | B1 | MA49835 | 21.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US46199 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MD3583120T | 28.02.2023 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MD3665192T | 31.12.2023 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46199 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2019009818 | 14.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2023001964 | 23.02.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY205898 | 19.11.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ756763 | 28.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20191551 | 24.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12019550147 | 15.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3583120T | 09.01.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3665192T | 27.11.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46199 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3583120T | 15.12.2022 | T | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3665192T | 25.09.2023 | T | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS63818 | 31.01.2023 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | EP18708025 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS64584 | 31.10.2023 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46199 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | EP18756531 | 10.08.2018 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201907419P | 27.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US18302 | 15.02.2018 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | US201762543559 | 10.08.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201907427Y | 27.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3583120T | 28.02.2023 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | EP18708025 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3665192T | 30.11.2023 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46199 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | EP18756531 | 10.08.2018 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT202200478T | 13.01.2023 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | EP18708025 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT202300347T | 13.11.2023 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | WO2018US46199 | 10.08.2018 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | EP18756531 | 10.08.2018 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI797106B | 01.04.2023 | B | TW201843174 | 16.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI821197B | 11.11.2023 | B | TW201920278 | 01.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA127985 | 06.03.2024 | C2 | Priority number | Date | US201762583314 | 08.11.2017 | US201762460692 | 17.02.2017 | US201762543658 | 10.08.2017 | WO2018US18371 | 15.02.2018 |